EP2523334 - Frequency inverter and method for operating same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2012/46] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dillig, Reinhold Zückshuter Str. 5 96117, Memmelsdorf / DE | 02 /
Herrmann, Bernd Zum Flughafen 23 91074, Herzogenaurach / DE | 03 /
Schwinn, Thomas Margeritenstr. 11 91074, Herzogenaurach / DE | 04 /
Benesch, Norbert Friedhofstr. 5b 90562, Heroldsberg / DE | 05 /
Lorz, Roland Lederhosenstr. 41 91341, Röttenbach / DE | 06 /
Roppelt, Bernd Trunstadter Hauptstr. 25 96191, Viereth-Trunstadt / DE | 07 /
Schierling, Hubert Pommernstr. 18 G 91052, Erlangen / DE | [2012/46] | Application number, filing date | 11165628.6 | 11.05.2011 | [2012/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2523334 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H02M5/458, H02J7/34 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
H02M5/458 (EP);
Y02B70/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Frequenzumrichter und Verfahren zum Betreiben desselben | [2012/46] | English: | Frequency inverter and method for operating same | [2012/46] | French: | Convertisseur de fréquence et procédé de fonctionnement de celui-ci | [2012/46] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/48] | 20.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]EP2259422 (HAMILTON SUNDSTRAND CORP [US]) [I] 1,2,5,8,9,11-13 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0016]; figure 1 * [Y] 3,4,6,7,10; | [Y]DE9216662U (SIEMENS AG MÜNCHEN DE) [Y] 4,6 * page 1, line 13 - line 33; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2007003544 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [Y] 10 * page 5, line 27 - line 31; figures 1-2 * * page 7, line 13 - line 20 *; | [Y]WO2010150549 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [Y] 3 * abstract *; | [YD]DE19739553 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [YD] 7 * figure 1 * | by applicant | DE19739553 |