EP2388522 - Monitoring device for a heating device and method for its operation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH C/IPE Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2011/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogink, Richard Boxbergerweg 46 8124 PB, Wesepe / NL | [2011/47] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/47] | Application number, filing date | 11165642.7 | 11.05.2011 | [2011/47] | Priority number, date | DE20101021348 | 22.05.2010 Original published format: DE102010021348 | [2011/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2388522 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2388522 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F23N5/24, F23N5/12 | [2011/47] | CPC: |
F23N5/245 (EP);
F23N5/123 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Überwachungseinrichtung für ein Heizgerät und Verfahren zu ihrem Betreiben | [2011/47] | English: | Monitoring device for a heating device and method for its operation | [2011/47] | French: | Dispositif de surveillance pour un appareil de chauffage et son procédé de fonctionnement | [2011/47] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/44] | 12.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2009110015 (BERTELLI & PARTNERS SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,10 * figure 1 * * page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 2 * * page 6, line 22 - page 7, line 9 * * page 4, line 7 - line 9 * * page 7, line 24 - page 8, line 3 * [I] 5,8,9,11-13; | [A]DE102004004065 (VAILLANT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]US5432095 (FORSBERG KENNETH E [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]US5472337 (GUERRA ROMEO E [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]EP1519114 (BETRONIC DESIGN B V [NL]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * |