EP2522553 - A system and method for air bag ventilation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autoliv Development AB Wallentinsvägen 22 447 83 Vårgårda / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | For all designated states Autoliv Development AB 83 Vargarda 447 83 Vårgårda / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haglund, Lennart Korsnabbbsgatan 5 SE-447, 32 Vargarda / SE | 02 /
Rydsmo, Erik 31 Hasthagen SE-466, 95 Sollebrunn / SE | 03 /
Svantesson, Anders 10 Tolleredshojden SE-448, 50 Tollered / SE | [2012/46] | Representative(s) | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart, et al Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11165729.2 | 11.05.2011 | [2012/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2522553 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2522553 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/239 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
B60R21/276 (EP);
B60R2021/2765 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/46] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren für Aribagbelüftung | [2013/30] | English: | A system and method for air bag ventilation | [2012/46] | French: | Système et procédé de ventilation d'airbag | [2012/46] |
Former [2012/46] | System und Verfahren für Airbagbelüftung | Examination procedure | 16.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 19.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.05.2011 | AL | 05.03.2014 | AT | 05.03.2014 | BE | 05.03.2014 | CY | 05.03.2014 | CZ | 05.03.2014 | DK | 05.03.2014 | EE | 05.03.2014 | ES | 05.03.2014 | FI | 05.03.2014 | HR | 05.03.2014 | IT | 05.03.2014 | LT | 05.03.2014 | LV | 05.03.2014 | MC | 05.03.2014 | MK | 05.03.2014 | MT | 05.03.2014 | NL | 05.03.2014 | PL | 05.03.2014 | RO | 05.03.2014 | RS | 05.03.2014 | SE | 05.03.2014 | SI | 05.03.2014 | SK | 05.03.2014 | SM | 05.03.2014 | TR | 05.03.2014 | IE | 11.05.2014 | LU | 11.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | BG | 05.06.2014 | NO | 05.06.2014 | GR | 06.06.2014 | IS | 05.07.2014 | PT | 07.07.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 11.05.2011 | |
AT | 05.03.2014 | ||
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
MK | 05.03.2014 | ||
MT | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
SM | 05.03.2014 | ||
TR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 11.05.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
GR | 06.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 11.05.2011 | |
AT | 05.03.2014 | ||
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
MT | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
SM | 05.03.2014 | ||
TR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 11.05.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
GR | 06.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 11.05.2011 | |
AT | 05.03.2014 | ||
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
MT | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
SM | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 11.05.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
GR | 06.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
MT | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
SM | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 11.05.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
GR | 06.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
MT | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
SM | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 11.05.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
MT | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 11.05.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 11.05.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 11.05.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 05.03.2014 | |
NO | 05.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006136206 (DALPHI METAL ESPANA SA [ES], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,11-13,15 * abstract * [I] 3,4,14; | [X]US6145878 (WEIKL HARALD [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 4 * |