EP2366343 - Seal element for anastomosis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/52] |
Former [2011/38] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, CT 06856 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bettuchi, Michael 40 Blacksmith Drive Middletown, CT 06457 / US | 02 /
Fowler, David, N. 40 Autumn CT Cheshire, CT 06410 / US | 03 /
Hadba, Ahmed, R. 37 Brentwood Drive Wallingford, CT 06492 / US | 04 /
Criscuolo, Christopher, J. 10 Fitzgerald Lane Branford, CT 06405 / US | 05 /
Kennedy, Jack 101 Hoit Lane Guilford, CT 27478 / US | [2011/38] | Representative(s) | McConchie, Connor Fraser D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [2011/38] | Application number, filing date | 11165760.7 | 29.09.2005 | [2011/38] | Priority number, date | US20040619238P | 15.10.2004 Original published format: US 619238 P | [2011/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2366343 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2366343 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2366343 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/11, A61B17/072, A61B17/115 | [2012/07] | CPC: |
A61B17/072 (EP,US);
A61B17/1152 (US);
A61B17/068 (US);
A61B17/07292 (EP,US);
A61B17/11 (US);
A61B17/115 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/38] | A61B17/11 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [2011/38] | Title | German: | Versiegelungselement für Anastomose | [2011/38] | English: | Seal element for anastomosis | [2011/38] | French: | Élément de joint pour l'anastomose | [2011/38] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/37] | 18.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 17.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05803193.1 / EP1799125 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE19924311 (RAU WALTER A [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,10-14 * column 2, line 46 - line 55 * * column 4, line 1 - line 15 * * column 5, line 25 - line 57 * * figure 3 * [I] 4-9; | [XI]EP1256317 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [X] 1,10-14 * paragraph [0016] * * column 11, line 9 - line 12 * * figure 11 *[I] 2-6; | [XI]WO03105698 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10-14 * page 8, line 26 - page 10, line 30 * * page 13, line 1 - line 31 * * figures 1-5,9,10 * [I] 5,6,8,9 | by applicant | US4354628 | US4655221 | US4788979 | US5014899 | US5040715 | US5124103 | US5392979 | US5423859 | US5543218 | US5716376 | US5915616 |