EP2387188 - Coordinated multipoint control aparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/46] | For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhou, Sheng c/o Tsinghua University Tsinghua University 100084 Beijing / CN | 02 /
Jia, Yunjian c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor Marunouchi Center Building 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyod-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Yang, Peng c/o Hitachi (China) Research & Development Corp. 301, North Wing Tower C Raycom Infotech Park 2 Kexueyuan Nanlu, Haidian District 100190 Beijing / CN | 04 /
Gong, Jie c/o Tsinghua University Tsinghua University 100084 Beijing / CN | 05 /
Niu, Zhisheng c/o Tsinghua University Tsinghua University 100084 Beijing / CN | 06 /
Geng, Lu c/o Hitachi (China) Research & Development Corp. 301, North Wing Tower C Raycom Infotech Park 2 Kexueyuan Nanlu, Haidian District 100190 Beijing / CN | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/46] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11166003.1 | 13.05.2011 | [2011/46] | Priority number, date | CN20101176728 | 13.05.2010 Original published format: CN201010176728 | [2011/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2387188 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/02 | [2011/46] | CPC: |
H04L25/0202 (EP,US);
H04L5/0035 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Koordinierte Mehrpunkt Steuervorrichtung und -verfahren | [2011/46] | English: | Coordinated multipoint control aparatus and method | [2011/46] | French: | Appareil et procédé de contrôle de multipoint coordonnée | [2011/46] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/46] | 19.08.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | CN20081035767 |