EP2524666 - Medical, in particular dental, handpiece with a temperature measuring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W & H Dentalwerk Bürmoos GmbH Ignaz-Glaser-Strasse 53 5111 Bürmoos / AT | [2012/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pruckner, Christian Billrothstraße 27/6 1190, Wien / AT | [2012/47] | Representative(s) | Benda, Ralf W & H Dentalwerk Bürmoos GmbH Ignaz-Glaser-Strasse 53 5111 Bürmoos / AT | [2012/47] | Application number, filing date | 11166638.4 | 19.05.2011 | [2012/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2524666 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2524666 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61C1/00, G01K13/00, G01K13/08, // A61B17/00 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
A61C1/0007 (EP);
G01K13/00 (EP);
G01K13/08 (EP);
A61B2017/00084 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/47] | A61C1/00, // A61B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/47] | Title | German: | Medizinisches, insbesondere dentales, Handstück mit Temperaturmessvorrichtung | [2012/47] | English: | Medical, in particular dental, handpiece with a temperature measuring device | [2012/47] | French: | Pièce à main médicale, en particulier dentaire, dotée d'un dispositif de mesure de température | [2012/47] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/47] | 24.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.02.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 30.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP17163464.5 / EP3210564 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.02.2018
ADMISSIBLE Kaltenbach & Voigt GmbH Bismarckring 39 88400 Biberach / DE Opponent's representative Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.02.2018
ADMISSIBLE Kaltenbach & Voigt GmbH Bismarckring 39 88400 Biberach / DE Opponent's representative Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | 23.02.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.06.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.05.2019 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/47] | 01.07.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.05.2011 | AL | 10.05.2017 | CY | 10.05.2017 | CZ | 10.05.2017 | DK | 10.05.2017 | EE | 10.05.2017 | ES | 10.05.2017 | FI | 10.05.2017 | HR | 10.05.2017 | IT | 10.05.2017 | LT | 10.05.2017 | LV | 10.05.2017 | MC | 10.05.2017 | MK | 10.05.2017 | MT | 10.05.2017 | NL | 10.05.2017 | PL | 10.05.2017 | PT | 10.05.2017 | RO | 10.05.2017 | RS | 10.05.2017 | SE | 10.05.2017 | SI | 10.05.2017 | SK | 10.05.2017 | SM | 10.05.2017 | TR | 10.05.2017 | AT | 19.05.2017 | IE | 19.05.2017 | LU | 19.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | BG | 10.08.2017 | NO | 10.08.2017 | GR | 11.08.2017 | IS | 10.09.2017 | [2022/26] |
Former [2020/33] | HU | 19.05.2011 | |
AL | 10.05.2017 | ||
CY | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MK | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
AT | 19.05.2017 | ||
IE | 19.05.2017 | ||
LU | 19.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/22] | HU | 19.05.2011 | |
CY | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MK | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
AT | 19.05.2017 | ||
IE | 19.05.2017 | ||
LU | 19.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 19.05.2011 | |
CY | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MK | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
AT | 19.05.2017 | ||
IE | 19.05.2017 | ||
LU | 19.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 19.05.2011 | |
CY | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
AT | 19.05.2017 | ||
IE | 19.05.2017 | ||
LU | 19.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.05.2011 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
AT | 19.05.2017 | ||
IE | 19.05.2017 | ||
LU | 19.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
AT | 19.05.2017 | ||
IE | 19.05.2017 | ||
LU | 19.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
AT | 19.05.2017 | ||
IE | 19.05.2017 | ||
LU | 19.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
AT | 19.05.2017 | ||
IE | 19.05.2017 | ||
LU | 19.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
IE | 19.05.2017 | ||
LU | 19.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
LU | 19.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 10.05.2017 | |
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | ES | 10.05.2017 | |
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 10.05.2017 | |
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 10.05.2017 | |
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB2438877 (ANGLIA POLYTECHNIC UNIVERSITY [GB]) [X] 1-4 * page 2 * * page 4, line 25 - line 26 * * figure 2 * [A] 15; | [XAI]US6752816 (CULP JERRY A [US], et al) [X] 6-9 * column 5, line 41 - column 8, line 34 * * column 54, line 45 - column 55, line 15 * * column 57, line 30 - line 41 * * figures 1-3, 8 * [A] 1-4,15 [I] 10-14; | [XA]US2010055642 (ROTHENWAENDER MICHAEL [AT], et al) [X] 6-9,14,15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * figures 1, 2, 5, 6 * [A] 1-4,10-13; | [XAI]WO2006110670 (SPRING HEALTH PRODUCTS INC [US], et al) [X] 9,14 * page 8, line 22 - line 27 * * page 11, line 4 - line 35 * * page 16, line 2 - page 17, line 17 * * figure 3 * [A] 10-13 [I] 15; | [XAI]US2009259244 (SHIMIZU KOH [JP]) [X] 9,10,12,14 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0044] * * figures 2, 8, 12 * [A] 13 [I] 11; | [A]WO2009072035 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 12,13 * page 1, line 22 - page 3, line 24 * * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 17 * * page 8, line 1 - page 14, line 9 * * figures 1-8 *; | [A]US5123839 (WEST CHARLES J [US]) [A] 1-4,6-15 * column 2, line 6 - column 4, line 6 * * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 59 * * figures 1-15 * | Examination | US2009322541 | by applicant | US6786897 | US2009322541 | Opposition | GB2438877 | US6752816 | US2010055642 | WO2006110670 | US2009259244 | WO2009072035 | US5123839 | US2009322541 | US6786897 | US2008234964 | US5516285 | JPH07255197 | JPH06280771 | JPH0347249 | JPH04332391 | US5179291 | WO2009138324 | EP2215981 | US7422582 | - Dyson et al, "Flow and free running speed characterization of dental air turbine handpieces", Journal of Dentistry, (19990900), vol. 27, no. 7, pages 465 - 477, XP055464209 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0300-5712(99)00037-8 | - Weber D. et al, Elektrische Temperaturmessung. Mit Thermoelementen und Widerstandsthermometen, (19910000), pages 1 - 51, XP055464210 | - "Chapter 2", Irrgang K. et al, Temperaturmesspraxis mit Widerstandsthermometen und Thermoelementen, Vulkan-Verlag, (20040000), pages 33 - 47, XP055464211 |