EP2388524 - System for cooling turbine combustor transition piece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2022/03] |
Former [2011/47] | For all designated states General Electric Company a New York Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHILA, Ronald James 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC 29615 / US | 02 /
CIHLAR, David William 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC 29615 / US | [2011/47] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [2022/03] |
Former [2013/08] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation-Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2011/47] | Gray, Thomas GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11166702.8 | 19.05.2011 | [2011/47] | Priority number, date | US20100784477 | 20.05.2010 Original published format: US 784477 | [2011/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2388524 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2388524 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2388524 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/00, F01D9/02 | [2011/47] | CPC: |
F23R3/002 (EP,US);
F01D9/023 (EP,US);
F02C7/12 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] |
Former [2011/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | System zur Kühlung eines Turbinenbrenner-Übergangsstücks | [2011/47] | English: | System for cooling turbine combustor transition piece | [2011/47] | French: | Système de refroidissement d'une pièce de transition d'une chambre de combustion de turbine | [2011/47] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2011 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 10.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2020 | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   01.12.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.05.2011 | AL | 19.01.2022 | AT | 19.01.2022 | CY | 19.01.2022 | CZ | 19.01.2022 | DK | 19.01.2022 | EE | 19.01.2022 | ES | 19.01.2022 | FI | 19.01.2022 | HR | 19.01.2022 | IT | 19.01.2022 | LT | 19.01.2022 | LV | 19.01.2022 | MC | 19.01.2022 | MK | 19.01.2022 | NL | 19.01.2022 | PL | 19.01.2022 | RO | 19.01.2022 | RS | 19.01.2022 | SE | 19.01.2022 | SI | 19.01.2022 | SK | 19.01.2022 | SM | 19.01.2022 | TR | 19.01.2022 | BG | 19.04.2022 | NO | 19.04.2022 | GR | 20.04.2022 | GB | 19.05.2022 | IE | 19.05.2022 | IS | 19.05.2022 | LU | 19.05.2022 | PT | 19.05.2022 | BE | 31.05.2022 | CH | 31.05.2022 | FR | 31.05.2022 | LI | 31.05.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 19.05.2011 | |
AL | 19.01.2022 | ||
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CY | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
IT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
MK | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
GB | 19.05.2022 | ||
IE | 19.05.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
LU | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 19.05.2011 | |
AL | 19.01.2022 | ||
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CY | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
IT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
GB | 19.05.2022 | ||
IE | 19.05.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
LU | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 19.05.2011 | |
AL | 19.01.2022 | ||
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
IT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
GB | 19.05.2022 | ||
IE | 19.05.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
LU | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
IT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
GB | 19.05.2022 | ||
IE | 19.05.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
LU | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
GB | 19.05.2022 | ||
IE | 19.05.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
LU | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IE | 19.05.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
LU | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IE | 19.05.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
LU | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IE | 19.05.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
LU | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
LU | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
LU | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
LU | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 19.01.2022 | |
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 19.01.2022 | |
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 19.01.2022 | |
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | NL | 19.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4903477 (BUTT GRAHAM P [CA]) [X] 1-4,10 * column 2, line 39 - column 4, line 2; figures 1-4 * [I] 5-9; | [XI]US2007180827 (DAWSON ROBERT W [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-4 * [I] 5-9; | [A]JPS5581228 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * paragraph [0003]; figures 1-4 * |