EP2415480 - Methods for Regulation of Stem Cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Washington 4311-11th Avenue NE, Suite 500 Seattle Washington, 98105-4608 / US | For all designated states Robarts Research Institute 100 Perth Drive London, ON N6A 5K8 / CA | [2012/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moon, Randall T 18531 57th Avenue Northeast Kenmore, WA 98028 / US | 02 /
Bhatia, Mickie 115 Garden Avenue Ancaster, Ontario L9G 4V9 / CA | 03 /
Trowbridge Jennifer, Jean 343 Iler Avenue Essex Ontario N8M 1T9 / CA | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | Atkinson, Jennifer Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Atkinson, Jennifer Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11166720.0 | 29.12.2005 | [2012/06] | Priority number, date | US20040026399 | 30.12.2004 Original published format: US 26399 | [2012/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2415480 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2415480 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
A61K48/005 (EP,US);
A61K35/14 (US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
C07K14/46 (EP,US);
C07K14/475 (EP,US);
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
C12N9/1205 (EP,US);
G01N33/5041 (EP,US);
G01N33/5073 (EP,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Regulierung von Stammzellen | [2012/06] | English: | Methods for Regulation of Stem Cells | [2012/06] | French: | Procédés de régulation de cellules souches | [2012/06] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 02.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/07] | 10.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/07] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05855989.9 / EP1838874 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050855989) is 19.05.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   24.02.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - CALVI L M ET AL, "Osteoblastic cells regulate the haematopoietic stem cell niche", NATURE: INTERNATIONAL WEEKLY JOURNAL OF SCIENCE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, UNITED KINGDOM, (20031023), vol. 425, no. 6960, doi:10.1038/NATURE02040, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 841 - 846, XP002389181 [X] 1-12,14,15 * page 845, column 2, paragraph 8 - page 846, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature02040 | [I] - MOLOFSKY A V ET AL, "Diverse mechanisms regulate stem cell self-renewal", CURRENT OPINION IN CELL BIOLOGY, CURRENT SCIENCE, LONDON, GB, (20041201), vol. 16, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.CEB.2004.09.004, ISSN 0955-0674, pages 700 - 707, XP004630254 [I] 1-12,14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ceb.2004.09.004 | [I] - Varnum-Finney, "Pluripotent, cytokine-dependent, hematopoietic stem cells are immortalized by constitutive Notch1 signaling", nature medicine, vol. 6, no. 11, (20001101), pages 1278 - 1281, URL: http://www.nature.com/nm/journal/v6/n11/pdf/nm1100_1278.pdf, (20111208), XP055014251 [I] 1-12,14,15 * the whole document * | [I] - STIER S ET AL, "Notch1 activation increases hematopoietic stem cell self-renewal in vivo and favors lymphoid over myeloid lineage outcome", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (20020401), vol. 99, no. 7, doi:10.1182/BLOOD.V99.7.2369, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 2369 - 2378, XP002317904 [I] 1-12,14,15 * page 2377, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood.V99.7.2369 | [I] - HAN WEI ET AL, "A soluble form of human Delta-like-1 inhibits differentiation of hematopoietic progenitor cells", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (20000301), vol. 95, no. 5, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 1616 - 1625, XP002236301 [I] 1-12,14,15 * the whole document * | [I] - G. F. HOYNE, "Notch signaling in the immune system", JOURNAL OF LEUKOCYTE BIOLOGY, (20030101), vol. 74, no. 6, doi:10.1189/jlb.0303089, ISSN 0741-5400, pages 971 - 981, XP055014201 [I] 1-12,14,15 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1189/jlb.0303089 | by applicant | US4275149 | US4518504 | US4722848 | US4736866 | US4752585 | US4816567 | US4870009 | EP0360257 | US5010175 | WO9117271 | WO9119735 | WO9200091 | WO9201047 | US5116943 | WO9320242 | US5254678 | US5288514 | WO9426877 | US5422260 | WO9518856 | US5486463 | US5506337 | US5519134 | US5525735 | WO9617924 | US5539083 | US5549974 | US5565332 | US5569588 | US5593853 | US5733743 | US5837242 | US5858657 | US5871907 | US6057117 | US6608063 | US2004092535 | US2004209878 | - BARONET, ARCH MED RES, (2003), vol. 34, pages 528 - 44 | - GIRALT, CURR HEMATOL REP, (2004), vol. 3, pages 165 - 72 | - VOLLWEILER ET AL., BONE MARROW TRANSPLANT, (2003), vol. 32, pages 1 - 7 | - MOSCARDO ET AL., LEUK LYMPHOMA, (2004), vol. 45, pages 11 - 8 | - COHENA, NAGLER, LEUK LYMPHOMA, (2003), vol. 44, pages 1287 - 99 | - DEVINE ET AL., BONE MARROW TRANSPLANT, (2003), vol. 31, pages 241 - 52 | - SHIH ET AL., J HEMATOTHER STEM CELL RES, (2000), vol. 9, pages 621 - 8 | - SROUR ET AL., J HEMATOTHER, (1999), vol. 8, pages 93 - 102 | - FRAME, COHEN, BIOCHEM J, (2001), vol. 359, pages 1 - 16 | - COHEN, BIOCHEM SOC TRANS, (1979), vol. 7, pages 459 - 80 | - EMBI ET AL., EUR J BIOCHEM, (1980), vol. 107, pages 519 - 27 | - BEHRENS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 280, pages 596 - 599 | - YOST ET AL., GENES DEV, (1996), vol. 10, pages 1443 - 1454 | - JIA ET AL., NATURE, (2002), vol. 416, pages 548 - 552 | - FOLTZ ET AL., CURR BIOL, (2002), vol. 12, pages 1006 - 1011 | - ESPINOSA ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2003), vol. 278, pages 32227 - 35 | - MURDOCH ET AL., PNAS, (2003), vol. 100, pages 3422 - 3427 | - REYA ET AL., NATURE, (2003), vol. 423, pages 409 - 14 | - BHARDWAJ ET AL., NAT IMMUNO, (2001), vol. 2, pages 172 - 80 | - KARANU ET AL., J EXP MED, (2000), vol. 192, pages 1365 - 72 | - KARANU ET AL., BLOOD, (2001), vol. 97, pages 1960 - 7 | - CLINE ET AL., DIAIBETES, (2002), vol. 51, pages 2903 - 2910 | - RING ET AL., DIABETES, (2003), vol. 52, pages 588 - 595 | - CLINE ET AL., DIABETES, (2002), vol. 51, pages 2903 - 2910 | - BERMAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 297, pages 1559 - 1561 | - KING, JOURNAL OF BIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 1, page 8 | - STECCA ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 1, page 9 | - FRANK-KAMENETSKY ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 1, page 10 | - CHEN ET AL., PROC. NATL, ACAD. SCI USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 14071 - 14076 | - LINDSELL ET AL., CELL, (1995), vol. 80, pages 909 - 917 | - JAY ET AL., CELL RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 14, pages 268 - 282 | - MOON ET AL., NATURE REVIEWS GENETICS, (2004), vol. 5, pages 689 - 699 | - KIRN ET AL., MOL. CANCER THER., (2002), vol. 1, pages 1355 - 1359 | - GUNTHER ET AL., GENES DEV., (2003), vol. 17, pages 488 - 501 | - DERKSEN ET AL., PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA, (2004), vol. 101, pages 6122 - 6127 | - GILES ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (2003), vol. 1653, pages 1 - 24 | - HE ET AL., NEOPLASIA, (2004), vol. 6, pages 7 - 14 | - ALBERDI, JBIOL CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 31605 - 12 | - ALBERDI, J BIOL CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 31605 - 12 | - AYMERICH ET AL., INVEST OPHTHALMOL VIS SCI., (2001), vol. 42, pages 3287 - 93 | - YAN ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 14973 - 8 | - JHO ET AL., MOL CELL BIOL, (2002), vol. 22, pages 1172 - 83 | - ISSACK, ZIFF, CELL GROWTH DIFFER, (1998), vol. 9, pages 837 - 45 | - JARRIAULT ET AL., NATURE, (1995), vol. 377, pages 355 - 8 | - MARIGO ET AL., 180, (1996), vol. 1 | - MARIGO, TABIN, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 9346 - 9351 | - VEEMAN M. ET AL., CURRENT BIOLOGY, (2003), vol. 13, pages 680 - 685 | - VEEMAN M. ET AL., DEV CELL, (2003), vol. 5, pages 367 - 377 | - ZLOKARNIK ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 279, pages 84 - 8 | - HEID ET AL., GENOME RES., (1996), vol. 6, page 986 | - THOMAS, CAPECCHI, CELL, (1987), vol. 51, page 503 | - LI ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 69, page 915 | - BRADLEY, Teratocarcinomas and Embryonic Stem Cells: A Practical Approach, IRL, OXFORD, (1987), pages 113 - 152 | - TSIRIGOTIS ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (2001), vol. 31, pages 120 - 126,128,130 | - DASGUPTA, FUCHS, DEVELOPMENT, (1999), vol. 126, pages 4557 - 4568 | - GOODRICH ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 277, pages 1109 - 1113 | - SMITH ET AL., ANN. REV. MICROBIOL, (1995), vol. 49, pages 807 - 838 | - SMITH, WATERMAN, ADV. APPL. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, page 482 | - NEEDLEMAN, WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, page 443 | - PEARSON, LIPMAN, PROC. NAT'L. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 2444 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUC. ACIDS RES., (1977), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - HENIKOFF, HENIKOFF, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 89, page 10915 | - CASTANOTTO ET AL., ADV. IN PHARMACOLOGY, (1994), vol. 25, pages 289 - 317 | - HAMPEL ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, pages 299 - 304 | - OJWANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6340 - 6344 | - YAMADA ET AL., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 1, pages 39 - 45 | - LEAVITT ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD, SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 699 - 703 | - LEAVITT ET AL., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 5, pages 1151 - 120 | - YAMADA ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1994), vol. 205, pages 121 - 126 | - HERSKOWITZ, NATURE, (1987), vol. 329, pages 219 - 22 | - FURKA, INT. J. PEPT. PROT. RES., (1991), vol. 37, pages 487 - 493 | - HOUGHTON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 354, pages 84 - 88 | - HOBBS ET AL., PROC.NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6909 - 6913 | - HAGIHARA ET AL., J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1992), vol. 114, page 6568 | - HIRSCHMANN ET AL., J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1992), vol. 114, pages 9217 - 9218 | - CHEN ET AL., J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1994), vol. 116, page 2661 | - CHO ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 261, page 1303 | - CAMPBELL ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1994), vol. 59, page 658 | - VAUGHN ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, pages 309 - 314 | - LIANG ET AL., SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 274, pages 1520 - 1522 | - BAUM, C&,EN, (19930118), page 33 | - MERRIFIELD, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1993), vol. 85, pages 2149 - 2154 | - GEYSEN ET AL., J. IMMUN. METH., (1987), vol. 102, pages 259 - 274 | - FRANK, DORING, TETRAHEDRON, (1988), vol. 44, pages 6031 - 6040 | - FODOR ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 251, pages 767 - 777 | - SHELDON ET AL., CLINICAL, (1993), vol. 39, pages 718 - 719 | - KOZAL ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (1996), vol. 2, pages 753 - 759 | - GARMESTANI ET AL., NUCL MED BIOL, (2001), vol. 28, page 409 | - KREITMAN, RJA ADV DRUG DEL REV, (1998), vol. 31, page 53 | - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495 | - CLACKSON ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), pages 624 - 628 | - MARKS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855 | - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525 | - REICHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 329 | - PRESTA, CURR. OP. STRUCT. BIOL., (1992), vol. 2, pages 593 - 596 | - HUSE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 246, pages 1275 - 1281 | - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546 | - QUEEN ET AL., PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 10029 - 10033 | - GRAHAM ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL., (1977), vol. 36, page 59 | - URLAUB, CHASIN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1980), vol. 77, page 4216 | - MATHER, BIOL. REPROD., (1980), vol. 23, pages 243 - 251 | - MATHER ET AL., ANNALS N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1982), vol. 383, pages 44 - 46 | - LANGER, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, page 1527 | - HANES, ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, (1997), vol. 28, pages 97 - 119 | - GLENN ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, page 851 | - PAUL ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 25, pages 3521 - 24 | - CEVE ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. ACTA., (1998), vol. 1368, pages 201 - 15 | WO1993US03868 | WO1996US10287 | WO1997US01019 | WO1997US01048 | WO1998US05223 |