EP2420657 - Coolant fan [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAHLE Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstr. 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bielesch, Thomas Fischeräckerstr. 5 75417, Mühlacker / DE | 02 /
Kielmann, Marc Wilhelmstr. 7 73776, Altbach / DE | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | Grauel, Andreas, et al Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Wartbergstrasse 14 70191 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/49] |
Former [2012/08] | Grauel, Andreas, et al Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Presselstrasse 10 70191 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 11167072.5 | 23.05.2011 | [2012/08] | Priority number, date | DE20101024978 | 24.06.2010 Original published format: DE102010024978 | [2012/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2420657 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2420657 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01P1/06 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
F01P1/06 (EP);
F01P2050/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/49] |
Former [2012/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Kühlluftgebläse | [2012/08] | English: | Coolant fan | [2012/08] | French: | Soufflante d'air frais | [2012/08] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/40] | 17.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.05.2011 | AL | 07.12.2016 | CY | 07.12.2016 | CZ | 07.12.2016 | DK | 07.12.2016 | EE | 07.12.2016 | ES | 07.12.2016 | FI | 07.12.2016 | HR | 07.12.2016 | IT | 07.12.2016 | LT | 07.12.2016 | LV | 07.12.2016 | MC | 07.12.2016 | MK | 07.12.2016 | MT | 07.12.2016 | NL | 07.12.2016 | PL | 07.12.2016 | RO | 07.12.2016 | RS | 07.12.2016 | SE | 07.12.2016 | SI | 07.12.2016 | SK | 07.12.2016 | SM | 07.12.2016 | TR | 07.12.2016 | BG | 07.03.2017 | NO | 07.03.2017 | GR | 08.03.2017 | IS | 07.04.2017 | PT | 07.04.2017 | AT | 23.05.2017 | GB | 23.05.2017 | IE | 23.05.2017 | LU | 23.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 23.05.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MK | 07.12.2016 | ||
MT | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
TR | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
AT | 23.05.2017 | ||
GB | 23.05.2017 | ||
IE | 23.05.2017 | ||
LU | 23.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 23.05.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MK | 07.12.2016 | ||
MT | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
AT | 23.05.2017 | ||
GB | 23.05.2017 | ||
IE | 23.05.2017 | ||
LU | 23.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 23.05.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MT | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
AT | 23.05.2017 | ||
GB | 23.05.2017 | ||
IE | 23.05.2017 | ||
LU | 23.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.05.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MT | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
AT | 23.05.2017 | ||
GB | 23.05.2017 | ||
IE | 23.05.2017 | ||
LU | 23.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MT | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
AT | 23.05.2017 | ||
GB | 23.05.2017 | ||
IE | 23.05.2017 | ||
LU | 23.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
AT | 23.05.2017 | ||
GB | 23.05.2017 | ||
IE | 23.05.2017 | ||
LU | 23.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
GB | 23.05.2017 | ||
IE | 23.05.2017 | ||
LU | 23.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
GB | 23.05.2017 | ||
LU | 23.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | ES | 07.12.2016 | |
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | ES | 07.12.2016 | |
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 07.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE10321732 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0017]; figures 1,2,4 * [A] 7,9; | [X]DE19950521 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 41; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5947189 (TAKEUCHI KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 39; figures 3,4,5,8 * |