EP2527060 - Casting method for permanent moulds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Georg Fischer Kokillenguss GmbH Wienerstrasse 41-43 3130 Herzogenburg / AT | [2013/04] |
Former [2012/48] | For all designated states Georg Fischer Automobilguss GmbH Wiener Strasse 41-43 3130 Herzogenburg / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mikota, Hans Bahnweg 23/2/1 3125 Statzendorf / AT | 02 /
Bühringer, Markus Anzengruberstrasse 60 3100 St. Pölten / AT | 03 /
Menk, Werner Pilatusstrasse 33 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | De Colle, Piergiacomo Georg Fischer AG Patentabteilung Amsler-Laffon-Strasse 9 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | De Colle, Piergiacomo Georg Fischer AG Patentabteilung Amsler-Laffon-Strasse 9 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | Application number, filing date | 11167276.2 | 24.05.2011 | [2012/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2527060 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B22C9/06, B22D17/22, B22D30/00 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
B22C9/065 (EP);
B22D17/2218 (EP);
B22D27/04 (EP);
B22D27/20 (EP);
B22D29/00 (EP);
B22D30/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Giessverfahren für Dauerformen | [2012/48] | English: | Casting method for permanent moulds | [2012/48] | French: | Procédé de coulée pour moules permanents | [2012/48] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/50] | 16.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]JP2009255118 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,5 * abstract * [A] 2,4,11-16 [I] 3,6-10; | [XAI]JP2007270195 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [X] 1,5 * abstract * [A] 2,4,11-16 [I] 3,6-10; | [XAI]JPS57109559 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,5 * abstract * [A] 2,4,11-16 [I] 3,6-10; | [X]JPH105966 (TOPY IND) [X] 1,5 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2004026504 | WO2004004948 |