EP2527604 - An arrangement in which an inner cylindrical casing is connected to a concentric outer cylindrical casing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2012/48] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keegan Colm 4 Greetwell Lane Nettleham, Lincolnshire LN2 2PN / GB | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | McGowan, Nigel George Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | McGowan, Nigel George Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11167345.5 | 24.05.2011 | [2012/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2527604 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/14, F01D25/16, F01D25/24, F01D25/26 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
F01D25/145 (EP,US);
F04D29/40 (US);
F01D25/164 (EP,US);
F01D25/24 (EP,US);
F01D25/26 (EP,US);
F05D2230/642 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anordnung, in der ein inneres Zylindergehäuse an ein konzentrisches äußeres Zylindergehäuse angeschlossen ist | [2012/48] | English: | An arrangement in which an inner cylindrical casing is connected to a concentric outer cylindrical casing | [2012/48] | French: | Agencement dans lequel un boîtier cylindrique interne est connecté à un boîtier cylindrique concentrique externe | [2012/48] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/49] | 09.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB206603 (HENRY LEWIS GUY, et al) [A] 1-9* page 3, line 1 - line 6 *; | [X]GB221632 (KARL BAUMANN, et al) [X] 1-4,8,9 * figure 2 * * claim 1 * * page 2, line 24 - line 31 *; | [X]GB219023 (JAN KIESWETTER) [X] 1-4,8,9 * page 3, line 4 - line 18 * * figure 5 *; | [X]GB243974 (JAN KIESWETTER) [X] 1-4,8,9 * figure 5 * * page 2, line 24 - line 39 *; | [XI]US2220616 (KARL RODER) [X] 1-5,8,9 * page 2, column 1, line 17 - line 22 * * page 2, column 2, line 11 - line 31 * * figure 9 * [I] 6,7; | [X]US4032253 (RYNCOSKY ROBERT G, et al) [X] 1-4,8,9 * column 2 * * figure 2 *; | [X]FR2951232 (SNECMA [FR]) [X] 1-4,8,9 * figure 9 * * figure 2 * * page 9, line 8 - line 13 * |