EP2524977 - Apparatus for manufacturing silicon substrate for solar cell using continuous casting facilitating temperature control and method of manufacturing silicon substrate using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Institute of Energy Research 71-2, Jang-dong Yuseong-gu Daejon 305-343 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | For all designated states Korea Institute of Energy Research 71-2 Jang-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-343 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jang, Bo Yun 711-1303, Yeolmae Maeul Apt., Jijok-dong, Yuseong-gu 305-330, Daejeon / KR | 02 /
Lee, Jin Seok 70-4 Jungchon-dong, Jung-gu 301-080, Daejeon / KR | 03 /
Kim, Joon Soo 815-202 Yeolmae Maeul Apt., Jijok-dong, Yuseong-gu 305-768, Daejeon / KR | [2012/47] | Representative(s) | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [2013/51] |
Former [2012/47] | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 11167355.4 | 24.05.2011 | [2012/47] | Priority number, date | KR20110047263 | 19.05.2011 Original published format: KR 20110047263 | [2012/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2524977 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2524977 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C30B28/10, B22D11/045, C01B33/00, C01B33/037, C30B11/00, C30B29/06 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
B22D11/045 (EP,US);
C30B28/10 (EP,KR,US);
C01B33/037 (EP,US);
C30B11/001 (EP,US);
C30B11/003 (EP,US);
C30B29/06 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/04 (KR);
Y02E10/50 (EP);
Y10T117/10 (EP,US);
Y10T117/1004 (EP,US);
Y10T117/1008 (EP,US);
Y10T117/1016 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/47] | C30B28/10, B22D11/045, C01B33/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/47] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines Silicium-Substrats für eine Solarzelle mit durchgehender gusserleichternder Temperatursteuerung und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Silicium-Substrats damit | [2012/47] | English: | Apparatus for manufacturing silicon substrate for solar cell using continuous casting facilitating temperature control and method of manufacturing silicon substrate using the same | [2012/47] | French: | Appareil de fabrication de substrat de silicone pour cellule solaire utilisant un boîtier continu facilitant le contrôle de la température et procédé de fabrication du substrat de silicone l'utilisant | [2012/47] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2011 | Examination requested [2012/47] | 21.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.05.2011 | AL | 18.12.2013 | AT | 18.12.2013 | BE | 18.12.2013 | BG | 18.12.2013 | CY | 18.12.2013 | CZ | 18.12.2013 | DK | 18.12.2013 | EE | 18.12.2013 | FI | 18.12.2013 | HR | 18.12.2013 | IT | 18.12.2013 | LT | 18.12.2013 | LV | 18.12.2013 | MC | 18.12.2013 | MK | 18.12.2013 | MT | 18.12.2013 | NL | 18.12.2013 | PL | 18.12.2013 | RO | 18.12.2013 | RS | 18.12.2013 | SE | 18.12.2013 | SI | 18.12.2013 | SK | 18.12.2013 | SM | 18.12.2013 | TR | 18.12.2013 | NO | 18.03.2014 | GR | 19.03.2014 | IS | 18.04.2014 | PT | 18.04.2014 | IE | 24.05.2014 | LU | 24.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | FR | 02.06.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 24.05.2011 | |
AT | 18.12.2013 | ||
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
IT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MK | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
TR | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
IE | 24.05.2014 | ||
LU | 24.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 24.05.2011 | |
AT | 18.12.2013 | ||
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
IT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
TR | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
IE | 24.05.2014 | ||
LU | 24.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 24.05.2011 | |
AT | 18.12.2013 | ||
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
IT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
IE | 24.05.2014 | ||
LU | 24.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
IT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
IE | 24.05.2014 | ||
LU | 24.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
IE | 24.05.2014 | ||
LU | 24.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
IE | 24.05.2014 | ||
LU | 24.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
IE | 24.05.2014 | ||
LU | 24.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
IE | 24.05.2014 | ||
LU | 24.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
IE | 24.05.2014 | ||
LU | 24.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 24.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 24.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 24.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | BE | 18.12.2013 | |
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | BE | 18.12.2013 | |
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 18.12.2013 | |
NO | 18.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4329195 (KUDO BOSSHI) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-6; claims 1-31 * * columns 3-4 *; | [A] - KOCH W ET AL, "PREPARATION, CHARACTERISATION AND CELL PROCESSING OF BAYER RGS SILICON FOILS (RIBBON GROWTH ON SUBSTRATE)", 2ND WORLD CONFERENCE ON PHOTOVOLTAIC SOLAR ENERGY CONVERSION. / 15TH EUROPEAN PV SOLAR ENERGY CONFERENCE. / 27TH US IEEE PHOTOVOLTAICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE. / 10TH ASIA/PACIFIC PV SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING CONFERENCE. VIENNA, AUSTRIA, JULY 6 - 10, 19, (19980706), ISBN 978-92-828-5419-8, pages 1254 - 1259, XP001137936 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [Introduction]; figure 6 * |