EP2527775 - Heat transfer plate for a plate-and-shell heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfa Laval Corporate AB PO Box 73 221 00 Lund / SE | [2012/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blomgren, Ralf Älgvägen 13 SE-239 34, Skanör / SE | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | Alfa Laval Attorneys Alfa Laval Corporate AB Group Patent P.O. Box 73 221 00 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Alfa Laval Attorneys Alfa Laval Corporate AB Patent Department P.O. Box 73 221 00 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 11167448.7 | 25.05.2011 | [2012/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2527775 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F28D9/00 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
F28D9/0006 (EP,US);
F28F3/08 (US);
F28D9/0012 (EP,US);
F28D9/0062 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wärmeübertragungsplatte für einen Platten-Kapsel-Wärmetauscher | [2012/48] | English: | Heat transfer plate for a plate-and-shell heat exchanger | [2012/48] | French: | Plaque d'échangeur thermique pour échangeur thermique de type plaque et enveloppe | [2012/48] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/22] | 29.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 22.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.08.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4708199 (YOGO TAKEJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14* figure - *; | [Y]DE3824073 (LAENGERER & REICH KUEHLER [DE]) [Y] 1,8,9 * figures 1, 2 * * column 5, line 10 - line 12 *; | [A]EP0622600 (KNECHT FILTERWERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * figure - *; | [Y]WO03006911 (ALFA LAVAL CORP AB [SE], et al) [Y] 10 * page 8, line 34 - line 36 *; | [XY]WO2010103190 (KONTU MAURI [FI]) [X] 1-7,13,14 * figures 1, 4, 5 * * page 9, line 5 - line 6 * * page 12, line 11 - line 13 * * page 11, line 7 - line 8 * [Y] 1,8-10 | by applicant | US6474408 | US7004237 |