EP2418201 - Polymorph forms of (2S)-(4E)-N-methyl-5-[3-(5-isopropoxypyridin) yl]-4-penten-2-amine p-hydroxybenzoate for the treatment of central nervous system disorders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/07] | Polymorph forms of (2S) - (4E) -N-methyl-5- (3-isopropoxypyridin) yl]-4-penten-2-amine for the treatment of central nervous system disorders | ||
[2013/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Targacept, Inc. 100 North Main Street Suite 1510 Winston-Salem, NC 27101 / US | [2014/24] |
Former [2012/07] | For all designated states Targacept, Inc. 200 East First Street, Suite 300 Winston-Salem, NC 27101-4165 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Munoz, Julio A. 214 Lakeside Drive Walnut Grove, NC 27052 / US | 02 /
Dull, Gary Maurice 6025 Shallowford Road Lewisville, NC 27003 / US | [2012/07] | Representative(s) | Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2012/07] | Harris, Jennifer Lucy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11167528.6 | 08.05.2007 | [2012/07] | Priority number, date | US20060746821P | 09.05.2006 Original published format: US 746821 P | [2012/07] | Previously filed application, date | WO2007US68446 | 08.05.2007 | [2012/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2418201 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2418201 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/63, A61K31/44, A61P25/28 | [2012/07] | CPC: |
C07D213/65 (EP,US);
C07D213/63 (KR);
A61K31/44 (KR);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/07] | Extension states | AL | 09.08.2012 | BA | 09.08.2012 | HR | 09.08.2012 | MK | 09.08.2012 | RS | 09.08.2012 | Title | German: | Polymorphe Formen von (2S)-(4E)-N-Methyl-5-[(3-(5-Isopropoxypyridin)yl]-4-Penten-2-Amin p-Hydroxybenzoate zur Behandlung von Erkrankungen des zentralen Nervensystems | [2013/40] | English: | Polymorph forms of (2S)-(4E)-N-methyl-5-[3-(5-isopropoxypyridin) yl]-4-penten-2-amine p-hydroxybenzoate for the treatment of central nervous system disorders | [2013/40] | French: | Formes polymorphes de (2S)-(4E)-N-méthyl-5- [3-(5-isopropoxypyridine)yl]-4-penten-2-amine p-hydroxybenzoate destinées au traitement de troubles du système nerveux central | [2013/40] |
Former [2012/07] | Polymorphe Formen von (2S)-(4E)-N-Methyl-5-(3-Isopropoxypyridin)-[l]-4-penten-2-amin zur Behandlung von Erkrankungen des zentralen Nervensystems | ||
Former [2012/07] | Polymorph forms of (2S) - (4E) -N-methyl-5- (3-isopropoxypyridin) yl]-4-penten-2-amine for the treatment of central nervous system disorders | ||
Former [2012/07] | Formes polymorphes de (2S) - (4E) -N-méthyl-5- (3-isopropoxypyridine) yl ̈-4-penten-2-amine destinées au traitement de troubles du système nerveux central | Examination procedure | 09.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 29.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07783431.5 / EP2021326 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070783431) is 18.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/04] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 14.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.08.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO9965876 (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R [US], et al) [AD] 1-14 * example 12 *; | [XP]WO2006053039 (TARGACEPT INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-14* example 2 * | by applicant | US4922901 | WO9408992 | WO9631475 | US5583140 | US5597919 | US5604231 | US5853696 | US5969144 | WO9965876 | US6953855 | - W. C. FRANK ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1978), vol. 43, page 2947 | - N. J. MALEK ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1982), vol. 47, page 5395 | - A. KALIVRETENOS; J. K. STILLE; L. S. HEGEDUS, J. ORG. CHEM., (1991), vol. 56, page 2883 | - C. V. GRECO ET AL., J. HETEOCYCLIC CHEM., (1970), vol. 7, no. 4, page 761 | - WILLIAMS ET AL., DN&P, (1994), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 205 - 227 | - ARNERIC ET AL., CNS DRUG REV., (1995), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 1 - 26 | - ARNERIC ET AL., EXP. OPIN. INVEST. DRUGS, (1996), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 79 - 100 | - BENCHERIF ET AL., JPET, (1996), vol. 279, page 1413 | - LIPPIELLO ET AL., JPET, (1996), vol. 279, page 1422 | - HOLLADAY ET AL., J. MED. CHEM, (1997), vol. 40, no. 28, pages 4169 - 4194 | - BANNON ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 279, pages 77 - 80 | - CHENG ET AL., BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL., (1973), vol. 22, page 3099 | - CHENG ET AL., BIOCHEM, PHARMACOL., (1973), vol. 22, page 3099 | US20050270018 | US20060746808 |