EP2361908 - Pyrimidine compounds useful for the treatment of CNS diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AbbVie Deutschland GmbH & Co KG Max-Planck-Ring 2a 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [2013/42] |
Former [2011/35] | For all designated states Abbott GmbH & Co. KG Max-Planck-Ring 2 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geneste, Hervé Rehbachstr. 42 67141 Neuhofen / DE | 02 /
Haupt, Andreas Schaelzigweg 52 68723 Schwetzingen / DE | 03 /
Braje, Wilfried Knollstrasse 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
Lubisch, Wilfried Hirtenaue 38 69118 Heidelberg / DE | 05 /
Steiner, Gerd Oberer Waldweg 1 67281 Kirchheim / DE | [2011/46] |
Former [2011/35] | 01 /
Geneste, Hervé Rehbachstr. 42 67141 Neuhofen / DE | ||
02 /
Haupt, Andreas Schaelzigweg 52 68723 Schwetzingen / DE | |||
03 /
Braje, Wilfried Meerfeldstr. 52 68163 Mannheim / DE | |||
04 /
Lubisch, Wilfried Hirtenaue 38 69118 Heidelberg / DE | |||
05 /
Steiner, Gerd Oberer Waldweg 1 67281 Kirchheim / DE | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Im Zollhof 1 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Ludwigsplatz 4 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 11167864.5 | 03.06.2005 | [2011/35] | Priority number, date | DE20041027358 | 04.06.2004 Original published format: DE102004027358 | [2011/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2361908 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, C07D413/12, C07D417/12, A61K31/506, A61P25/36 | [2011/35] | CPC: |
C07D417/12 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/35] | Title | German: | Zur Behandlung von zentralnervösen Erkrankungen geeignete Pyrimidinverbindungen | [2011/35] | English: | Pyrimidine compounds useful for the treatment of CNS diseases | [2011/35] | French: | Composés de pyrimidine utiles pour le traitement de troubles du SNC | [2011/35] | Examination procedure | 29.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/22] | 28.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05750829.3 / EP1751116 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050750829) is 18.05.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO9725324 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-19 * page 1, lines 5-9 * * Seite 4, Formel I * * page 5, lines 11-19 * * page 6, lines 25-35 * * page 7, lines 5-25 * * page 20, line 25 - page 21, line 20 *; | [A] - A. ORJALES ET AL., "New 3-benzoisothiazolyl and 3-benzoisoxazolylpiperazine derivatives with atypical antipsychotic binding profile", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY., EDITIONS SCIENTIFIQUE ELSEVIER; PARIS, FR, (2002), vol. 37, pages 721 - 730, XP004383155 [A] 1-19 * page 722; figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0223-5234(02)01391-0 | by applicant | WO9602519 | WO9602520 | WO9602249 | WO9602246 | WO9902503 | WO0042036 | WO0042037 | WO0042038 | WO0067847 | WO9725324 | DE10304870 | DE3800386 | EP0244697 | DE19728996 | DE19735410 | - "The Dopamine D3 Receptor as a Target for Antipsychotics", J.C. SCHWARTZ ET AL., Novel Antipsychotic Drugs, RAVEN PRESS, (1992), pages 135 - 144 | - M. DOOLEY ET AL., DRUGS AND AGING, (1998), vol. 12, pages 495 - 514 | - J.N. JOYCE, "The Dopamine D3 Receptor as a Therapeutic Target for Antipsychotic and Antiparkinsonian Drugs", PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTICS, (2001), vol. 90, pages 231 - 59 | - P. SOKOLOFF ET AL., "Localization and Function of the D3 Dopamine Receptor", ARZNEIM. FORSCH./DRUQ RES., (1992), vol. 42, no. 1, page 224, XP000250098 | - P. SOKOLOFF ET AL., "Molecular Cloning and Characterization of a Novel Dopamine Receptor (D3) as a Target for Neuroleptics", NATURE, (1990), vol. 347, doi:doi:10.1038/347146a0, page 146, XP002027883 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/347146a0 | - Fortschritte der Arzneimittelforschung, BIRKHäUSER VERLAG, (1966), vol. 10, page 224 | - "Analogie zu bekannten Verfahren hergestellt werden, wie beispielsweise beschrieben", J. ORG. CHEM., (1981), vol. 46, no. 18, page 3719 | - J. HETEROCYCL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 38, no. 4, pages 961 - 964 | - J. HETEROCYCL. CHEM., (1983), vol. 20, no. 3, page 663.666 | - J. MED. CHEM., (1986), vol. 29, no. 10, pages 1832 - 1840 | - J. MED. CHEM., (2000), vol. 43, pages 3718 - 3735 | - J. MED. CHEM., (1986), vol. 29, no. 1, pages 1 - 8 | - CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (2000), vol. 49, no. 7, pages 822 - 829 | - ORG. LETT., (2002), vol. 4, no. 16, pages 2691 - 2694 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1972), vol. 37, page 2849 | - TETRAHEDRON, (2001), vol. 57, pages 9199 - 9225 | - J. HETEROCYCL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 38, no. 4, pages 961 - 4 | - J. MED. CHEM., (1986), vol. 29, pages 1832 - 40 | - J. MED. CHEM., (2000), vol. 43, pages 3718 - 35 | - CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (2001), vol. 49, pages 822 - 9 | - J. HETEROCYCL. CHEM, (1983), vol. 20, pages 663 - 6 | - ORG. LETT, (2002), vol. 4, pages 261 - 4 | - ORG. LETT., (2002), vol. 4, pages 261 - 4 |