EP2439004 - Multiple endless belt type band sheet coiling tension applying apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Development Consultants, Inc. 5-29, Hizukushi-cho Sasebo-city Nagasaki-ken 857-0852 / JP | [2012/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashikawa, Yoshito 623, Kashimae-cho Sasebo-city Nagasaki-ken, Nagasaki 858-0922 / JP | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11167881.9 | 27.05.2011 | [2012/15] | Priority number, date | JP20100227296 | 07.10.2010 Original published format: JP 2010227296 | [2012/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2439004 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2439004 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B21C47/00 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
B21C47/006 (EP,US);
B65H23/10 (KR);
B21C47/02 (KR);
B21C47/26 (KR);
B21C47/3458 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung mit Mehrfach-Endlosriemen zum Anlegen einer Bandfolienwickelspannung | [2012/15] | English: | Multiple endless belt type band sheet coiling tension applying apparatus | [2012/15] | French: | Appareil de type à courroie sans fin multiple pour appliquer une tension d'enroulement sur un feuillard | [2012/15] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 11.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0427580 (AUXMET [FR]) [Y] 1-5 * column 4, line 16 - line 52; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]JPH03147665 (NIPPON DEV CONSULT) [Y] 1-5 * abstract *; | [Y]DE3111781 (JAPAN DEV CONSULT [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * page 12, paragraph last - page 13, paragraph first; figure 3 * | by applicant | JPH0774061B | JP3769730B | JP3947714B | US3735937 |