EP2390645 - Device for testing an optics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dovideq Holding B.V. Keulenstraat 8g 7418 ET Deventer / NL | [2013/21] |
Former [2011/48] | For all designated states Dovideq Holding B.V. Postbus 29 7450AA Holten / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Braak, Menno Samuel Bornsestraat 129 7607 KL Almelo / NL | 02 /
Dommerholt, Albertus Johannes Postweg 129 7451 TV Holten / NL | [2011/48] | Representative(s) | Mink-Lindenburg, Charlotte Hildegard, et al Octrooibureau Mink B.V. P.O. Box 85658 2508 CJ The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | Mink-Lindenburg, Charlotte Hildegard, et al Octrooibureau Mink B.V. P.O. Box 53 7600 AB Almelo / NL | ||
Former [2011/48] | Mink-Lindenburg, Charlotte Hildegard Octrooibureau Mink B.V. Twentepoort Oost 61-25 7609 RG Almelo / NL | Application number, filing date | 11167892.6 | 27.05.2011 | [2011/48] | Priority number, date | NL20102004777 | 28.05.2010 Original published format: NL 2004777 | [2011/48] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2390645 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2390645 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2390645 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01M11/00, G01M11/02, G01M11/08 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
G01M11/00 (EP,US);
G01N21/17 (US);
A61B1/00057 (EP,US);
G01M11/0235 (EP,US);
G01M11/0264 (EP,US);
G01M11/088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/48] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Optikprüfung | [2011/48] | English: | Device for testing an optics | [2011/48] | French: | Dispositif de test d'un optique | [2011/48] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/14] | 18.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2011 | AL | 22.05.2013 | AT | 22.05.2013 | CY | 22.05.2013 | CZ | 22.05.2013 | DK | 22.05.2013 | EE | 22.05.2013 | FI | 22.05.2013 | HR | 22.05.2013 | IT | 22.05.2013 | LT | 22.05.2013 | LV | 22.05.2013 | MC | 22.05.2013 | MK | 22.05.2013 | MT | 22.05.2013 | PL | 22.05.2013 | RO | 22.05.2013 | RS | 22.05.2013 | SE | 22.05.2013 | SI | 22.05.2013 | SK | 22.05.2013 | SM | 22.05.2013 | TR | 22.05.2013 | IE | 27.05.2013 | LU | 27.05.2013 | BG | 22.08.2013 | NO | 22.08.2013 | GR | 23.08.2013 | ES | 02.09.2013 | IS | 22.09.2013 | PT | 23.09.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 27.05.2011 | |
AT | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
MK | 22.05.2013 | ||
MT | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
SM | 22.05.2013 | ||
TR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IE | 27.05.2013 | ||
LU | 27.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
MK | 22.05.2013 | ||
MT | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
SM | 22.05.2013 | ||
TR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IE | 27.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
MT | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
SM | 22.05.2013 | ||
IE | 27.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
MT | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
SM | 22.05.2013 | ||
IE | 27.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
MT | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
IE | 27.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
IE | 27.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 22.05.2013 | |
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6498642 (DUCKETT GEORGE E [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * claims 1-20 * * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 59 *; | [A]US2003107726 (HIRT JOACHIM [DE], et al) [A] 1-19* the whole document * | by applicant | WO9841836 | US2003107726 |