EP2409949 - Filling device for filling containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstraße 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2012/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Häuslmann, Mathias Malteserplatz 16 92224 Amberg / DE | [2012/04] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11168165.6 | 31.05.2011 | [2012/04] | Priority number, date | DE20101031524 | 19.07.2010 Original published format: DE102010031524 | [2012/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2409949 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B67C3/20, G01G17/04, G01G3/13, G01G13/02 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
B67C3/202 (EP,US);
G01G13/02 (EP,US);
G01G17/04 (EP,US);
G01G3/13 (EP,US);
G01L9/08 (US)
|
Former IPC [2012/04] | B67C3/20, G01G17/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Füllvorrichtung zum Befüllen von Behältern | [2012/04] | English: | Filling device for filling containers | [2012/04] | French: | Dispositif de remplissage destiné au remplissage de récipients | [2012/04] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 24.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/30] | 03.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0373396 (AZIONARIA COSTRUZIONI ACMA SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-5,7,9-11 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 7; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP0517172 (GRUBER GUENTHER [AT]) [Y] 1-7,9-11 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 19; figure 1 *; | [YD]EP1025424 (SERAC GROUP [FR]) [YD] 6 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] , [0022]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2009156020 (IKA WERKE GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1,10,11 * page 7, line 8 - page 8, line 10; figure 2 *; | [A]DE102004021832 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [A] 1,10,11 * paragraph [0002] *; | [A]WO2007093878 (AZIONARIA COSTRUZIONI ACMA SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1,4,10,11 * page 2, line 25 - line 27 * * page 10, line 7 - line 11; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP2194020 (KRONES AG [DE]) [A] 1,10,11 * abstract *; | [A]WO0188698 (IMA SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1,10,11 * abstract * | by applicant | EP1025424 | DE102008030721 |