EP2530540 - Method for controlling a rotation of a tool and control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2012/49] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spielmann, Ralf Robert-Leicht-Strasse 157A 70569 Stuttgart / DE | [2012/49] | Application number, filing date | 11168181.3 | 31.05.2011 | [2012/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2530540 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2530540 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/416, B23Q15/22 | [2012/49] | CPC: |
G05B19/416 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/20] |
Former [2012/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung einer Rotationsbewegung eines Werkzeugs und Steuereinrichtung | [2012/49] | English: | Method for controlling a rotation of a tool and control device | [2012/49] | French: | Procédé de commande d'un mouvement de rotation d'un outil et dispositif de commande | [2012/49] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 09.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/38] | 03.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 07.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees CZ, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 09.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 09.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.08.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 09.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 09.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.08.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 09.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 09.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.08.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.05.2011 | AL | 18.05.2016 | BG | 18.05.2016 | CY | 18.05.2016 | CZ | 18.05.2016 | DK | 18.05.2016 | EE | 18.05.2016 | ES | 18.05.2016 | FI | 18.05.2016 | HR | 18.05.2016 | IS | 18.05.2016 | LT | 18.05.2016 | LV | 18.05.2016 | MC | 18.05.2016 | MK | 18.05.2016 | MT | 18.05.2016 | NL | 18.05.2016 | PL | 18.05.2016 | RO | 18.05.2016 | RS | 18.05.2016 | SE | 18.05.2016 | SI | 18.05.2016 | SK | 18.05.2016 | SM | 18.05.2016 | TR | 18.05.2016 | BE | 31.05.2016 | IE | 31.05.2016 | LU | 31.05.2016 | GB | 18.08.2016 | NO | 18.08.2016 | GR | 19.08.2016 | PT | 19.09.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 31.05.2011 | |
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IS | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
MT | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
TR | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
IE | 31.05.2016 | ||
LU | 31.05.2016 | ||
GB | 18.08.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 31.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IS | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
MT | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
TR | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
IE | 31.05.2016 | ||
LU | 31.05.2016 | ||
GB | 18.08.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 31.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
TR | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
IE | 31.05.2016 | ||
LU | 31.05.2016 | ||
GB | 18.08.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 31.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
IE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GB | 18.08.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
IE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GB | 18.08.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 18.05.2016 | |
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 18.05.2016 | |
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 18.05.2016 | |
NO | 18.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5858142 (TULLY LOWELL R [US], et al) [I] 1-6 * column 4 - column 8; figures 2, 5-7 *; | [A]US2003170085 (KAKINO YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US5827020 (FUJITA JUN [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1760562 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2062898 (OLIVETTI & CO SPA) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5827020 | US7346423 | US4408280 |