EP2409576 - Home and professional ice cream product making machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carpigiani Group - ALI S.p.A. Via Camperio 9 20123 Milano / IT | [2012/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cocchi, Andrea Via del Bracciante, 20 40012 Calderara Di Reno (Bologna) / IT | 02 /
Lazzarini, Roberto c/o ALI S.p.A.- DIVISIONE CARPIGIANI Via Emilia, 45 40011 ANZOLA DELL'EMILIA Bologna / IT | [2012/04] | Representative(s) | Bianciardi, Ezio Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [2012/04] | Application number, filing date | 11168246.4 | 31.05.2011 | [2012/04] | Priority number, date | IT2010BO00466 | 22.07.2010 Original published format: IT BO20100466 | [2012/04] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2409576 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2409576 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A23G9/12, A23G9/22 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
A23G9/22 (EP,US);
A23G9/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Title | German: | Speiseeisbereitungsmaschine für den Hausgebrauch und professionellen Gebrauch | [2012/04] | English: | Home and professional ice cream product making machine | [2012/04] | French: | Sorbetière domestique ou professionnelle | [2012/04] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 19.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.05.2011 | AL | 30.01.2013 | AT | 30.01.2013 | BE | 30.01.2013 | CY | 30.01.2013 | CZ | 30.01.2013 | DK | 30.01.2013 | EE | 30.01.2013 | FI | 30.01.2013 | HR | 30.01.2013 | LT | 30.01.2013 | LV | 30.01.2013 | MC | 30.01.2013 | MK | 30.01.2013 | MT | 30.01.2013 | NL | 30.01.2013 | PL | 30.01.2013 | RO | 30.01.2013 | RS | 30.01.2013 | SE | 30.01.2013 | SI | 30.01.2013 | SK | 30.01.2013 | SM | 30.01.2013 | TR | 30.01.2013 | BG | 30.04.2013 | NO | 30.04.2013 | GR | 01.05.2013 | ES | 11.05.2013 | IS | 30.05.2013 | PT | 30.05.2013 | IE | 31.05.2013 | LU | 31.05.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 31.05.2011 | |
AT | 30.01.2013 | ||
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
MK | 30.01.2013 | ||
MT | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
RS | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
SM | 30.01.2013 | ||
TR | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
IE | 31.05.2013 | ||
LU | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
MK | 30.01.2013 | ||
MT | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
RS | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
SM | 30.01.2013 | ||
TR | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
IE | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
MT | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
RS | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
SM | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
IE | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
MT | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
RS | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
IE | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
RS | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
IE | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
RS | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
RS | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
RS | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RS | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/43] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RS | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 30.01.2013 | |
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 30.01.2013 | |
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 30.01.2013 | |
NO | 30.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2881928 (SEB SA [FR]) [X] 1-12 * page 1, line 8 - page 13, line 22; figure -; claim - *; | [X]US4885917 (SPECTOR DONALD [US]) [X] 1-12 * column 2, line 9 - column 6, line 12; figure -; claim - *; | [X]GB1183551 (APAW SA [CH]) [X] 1-12 * page 1, line 16 - page 3, line 64; figure -; claim - *; | [X]GB2178150 (NIPPON LIGHT METAL CO) [X] 1-12 * page 1, line 5 - page 6, line 12; figure -; example -; claim - *; | [X]US4681458 (CAVALLI ALFREDO [IT]) [X] 1-12 * column 1, line 9 - column 2, line 59; figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP0179027 (GAGGIA BREVETTI [IT]) [X] 1-12 * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 9; figure -; claim - *; | [X]FR2269308 (WIETZEL A [FR]) [X] 1-12 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 22; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP1396195 (DE LONGHI SPA [IT]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE202009014551U (WILLCOX INVEST S A [LU]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |