EP2393065 - Method and device for checking whether a surface of an object includes a valuable document [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2011/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lübben, Hauke Regiment-Piemont-Str. 4d 78315 Radolfzell / DE | [2011/49] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/49] | Application number, filing date | 11168383.5 | 01.06.2011 | [2011/49] | Priority number, date | DE20101022532 | 02.06.2010 Original published format: DE102010022532 | [2011/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2393065 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2393065 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/00, G07D7/00, G07D7/20 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
G07B17/00661 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00443 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00653 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00709 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die Prüfung, ob eine Oberfläche eines Gegenstands mit einem Wertdokument versehen ist | [2011/49] | English: | Method and device for checking whether a surface of an object includes a valuable document | [2011/49] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour vérifier si la surface d'un objet est pourvue d'un document de valeur | [2011/49] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/07] | 17.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE10105273 (DEUTSCHE POST AG [DE]) [AD] 1-8 * column 1, paragraph 5 - paragraph 6 * * column 3, paragraph 33 - column 4, paragraph 43 *; | [Y]WO03027965 (DEUTSCHE POST AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * page 15, line 34 - page 18, line 9 *; | [A]US2008019563 (GOODWIN MARK D [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 1, paragraph 3 ** page 7, paragraph 76 - paragraph 80 *; | [YD]DE102007058680 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [YD] 1-8 * page 2, paragraph 5 * * page 3, paragraph 15 - page 4, paragraph 33 * | by applicant | DE10105273 | DE10106632 | EP1909234 | DE102007058680 |