EP2530089 - Neutralising prolactin receptor antibody Mat3 and its therapeutical use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | [2012/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freiberg, Christoph Bayer Schering Pharma Aktiengesellschaft BSP-GDD-GB-BRG-PBC Protein Expression&Cell Line Developm. 2 Lipkenskothen 10 42113 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
Otto, Christiane Bayer Schering Pharma AG GDD-GTR-WHC-FFC Femals Fertility Control & MM 5 Monbijouplatz 9 10178 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Linden, Lars Bruchstrasse 72 40235 Düsseldorf / DE | 04 /
Harrenga, Alex Bayer Schering Pharma AG BSP-GDD-GB-BRG-PBC Protein Expression&Cell Line Developm. 2 Sadowastrasse 17 42115 Wuppertal / DE | 05 /
Trautwein, Mark Bayer Schering Pharma AG BSP-GDD-GB-BRG-PBC Protein Expression&Cell Line Developm. 2 Nelkenweg 2 42489 Wülfrath / DE | 06 /
Greven, Simone Bayer Schering Pharma AG BSP-GDD-GB-BRG-PBC Protein Expression&Cell Line Developm. 2 Am Schneckenacker 45 41541 Dormagen / DE | 07 /
Wilmen, Andreas Bayer Schering Pharma AG BSP-GDD-GB-BRG-PBC Protein Expression&Cell Line Developm. 2 Arndtstrasse 5 50676 Köln / DE | [2012/49] | Application number, filing date | 11168644.0 | 03.06.2011 | [2012/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2530089 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61P5/00 | [2012/49] | CPC: |
C07K16/2869 (EP,US);
C07K16/28 (KR);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/18 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/08 (EP);
C07K16/3015 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Neutralisierender Antikörper Mat3 gegen den Prolactinrezeptor und dessen therapeutische Verwendung | [2012/49] | English: | Neutralising prolactin receptor antibody Mat3 and its therapeutical use | [2012/49] | French: | Anticorps neutralisant Mat3 contre le récepteur de prolactine et son utilisation thérapeutique | [2012/49] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 31.01.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/10] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 01.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 01.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 01.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 01.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.2011 | Decision despatched | 01.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 01.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.2011 | Decision despatched |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]US2007269438 (ELENBAAS BRIAN [US], et al) [ID] 1-27 * example - *; | [ID]WO2008022295 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [ID] 1-27 * example - *; | [T]EP2332995 (BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AG [DE]) [T] * the whole document *; | [ID] - J. SISSOM ET AL., "Anti-growth action on mouse mammary and prostate glands of a monoclonal antibody to prolactin receptor.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, U.S.A., (198812), vol. 133, no. 3, pages 589 - 595, XP008068076 [ID] 1-27 * abstract * | [A] - J. SISSOM-DEMORE ET AL., "A monoclonal antibody to prolactin receptor inhibits proliferation of breast cancer cells.", THE FASEB JOURNAL, U.S.A., (19960606), vol. 10, no. 6, page A1389, XP008113243 [A] 1-27 * abstract 2244 * | by applicant | US4399216 | US4510245 | US4634665 | US4657760 | US4816567 | US4968615 | US5168062 | US5179017 | US5206344 | US5225212 | US5766886 | US6300064 | WO03004989 | WO03008583 | US6989250 | WO2006110585 | US2007269438 | WO2008022295 | - BIOESSAYS, (2006), vol. 28, pages 1051 - 1055 | - ENDOCRINE REVIEWS, (1998), vol. 19, pages 225 - 268 | - ANNU. REV. PHYSIOL., (2002), vol. 64, pages 47 - 67 | - NATURE CLINICAL PRACTICE ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, (2006), vol. 2, no. 10, pages 571 - 581 | - BREAST CANCER RES. TREAT., (1989), vol. 14, pages 289 - 29 | - LUPUS, (1998), vol. 7, pages 414 - 419 | - AM J PATHOL, (1988), vol. 133, pages 589 - 595 | - PITUITARY, (2003), vol. 6, pages 89 - 95 | - ACTA OBSTET GYNECOL SCAND, (2002), vol. 81, pages 5 - 10 | - RETTER, ALTHAUS HH, MUNCH R, MOLLER W, "VBASE2, an integrative V gene database", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (20050101), vol. 33, pages D671 - 4 | - PNAS, (2008), vol. 105, no. 38, page 14533 | - J. CLIN. ENDOCRINOL. METAB., (2010), vol. 95, no. 1, page 271 | - S6DERLIND ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2000), vol. 18, pages 852 - 856 | - ROETHLISBERGER, D. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2005), vol. 347, pages 773 - 789 | - VIRNEKAS, B., GE, L., P ÜCKTHUN, A., SCHNEIDER, K.C., WELLNHOFER, G., MORONEY S.E., "Trinucleotide phosphoramidites: ideal reagents for the synthesis of mixed oligonucleotides for random mutagenesis", NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1994), vol. 22, page 5600 | - KHORANA ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1971), vol. 72, pages 209 - 217 | - URLAUB, CHASIN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 4216 - 4220 | - R. J. KAUFMAN, P. A. SHARP, MOL. BIOL., (1982), vol. 159, pages 601 - 621 | - COLLIGAN, Current Protocols in Immunology | - OBSTET. GYNECOL. CLIN. NORTH. AM., (1997), vol. 24, pages 235 - 238 | - HUM. REPROD., (2002), vol. 17, no. 19, pages 2715 - 2724 | - OBSTET. GYNECOL., (1984), vol. 64, pages 151 - 154 | - FERTIL. STERIL., (1998), vol. 69, pages 1042 - 1047 | - BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (2006), vol. 149, pages 133 - 135 | - LIFE SCIENCES, (1992), vol. 51, pages 1119 - 1125 | - EPIDEMIOL REV, (1997), vol. 19, pages 310 - 327 | - J MAMMARY, GLAND BIOL NEOPLASIA, (2005), vol. 10, pages 325 - 335 | - ZENTRALBL GYNAKOL, (1997), vol. 119, pages 54 - 58 | - AM J OBSTET GYNECOL, (1986), vol. 154, pages 161 - 179 | - AM J OBSTET, (1986), vol. 154, pages 161 - 179 | - CLIN ENDOCRINOL, (1985), vol. 23, pages 699 - 704 | - PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (2008), vol. 105, pages 14533 - 14538 | - METHODS IN MAMMARY GLAND BIOLOGY AND BREAST CANCER RESEARCH, (2000), pages 101 - 107 | - GENES DEV, (1997), vol. 11, pages 167 - 178 | - HUMAN REPROD., (2004), vol. 19, pages 1911 - 1916 | - HUMAN REPROD., (2003), vol. 18, pages 2672 - 2677 | - FRONTIERS, NEUROENDOCRINOLOGY, (2001), vol. 22, pages 140 - 145 | - ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1978), vol. 102, pages 1657 - 1661 | - J. CLIN. INVEST., (1997), vol. 99, page 618 | - ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1997), vol. 138, page 4410 | - ENDOCRINOLOGY, (2003), vol. 144, page 2269 | - JAMA, (2002), vol. 233, pages 321 - 333 | - CLEVELAND CLINIC JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (2009), vol. 76, pages 361 - 367 | - BRITISH JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY, (2008), vol. 159, pages 300 - 305 | - AKTUELLE DERMATOLOGIE, (2005), vol. 31, pages 109 - 116 | - J CLIN ENDOCRINOL METAB, (1998), vol. 83, pages 667 - 674 | - INT. J. CANCER, (1993), vol. 55, no. 5, pages 712 - 721 | - CANCER LETT, (2006), vol. 243, pages 160 - 169 | - EUR J SURG ONCOL, (1994), vol. 20, pages 118 - 121 | - J CLIN INVEST, (1997), vol. 100, pages 2744 - 2751 | - PAUL KELLY, PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (2008), vol. 105, no. 38, pages 14533 - 14538 | - SCATCHARD ET AL., ANN N.Y. ACAD. SCL, (1949), vol. 51, page 660 | - LABRIJN ET AL., CURRENT OPINION IN IMMUNOLOGY, (2008), vol. 20, pages 479 - 485 | - SAZINSKY ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI., (2008), vol. 105, no. 51, page 20169 | - SIMMONS ET AL., J. OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, (2002), vol. 263, pages 133 - 147 | - HEZAREH ET AL., J. OF VIROLOGY, (2001), vol. 75, no. 24, pages 12161 - 12168 | - SCHUURMAN, J. ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 97, pages 693 - 698 | - ALLEN ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 48, no. 17, pages 3755 - 3766 | - AN ET AL., MABS, (2009), vol. 1, no. 6 | - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495 | - JOHNSON, WU, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2000), vol. 28, pages 214 - 218 | - CHOTHIA ET AL., J. MOL.BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - ZAPATA ET AL., PROTEIN ENG., (1995), vol. 8, no. 10, pages 1057 - 1062 | - PLUCKTHUN, The Pharmacology of Monoclonal Antibodies, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1994), vol. 113, pages 269 - 315 | - CARLSSON, S6DERLIND, EXP. REV. MOL. DIAGN., (2001), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 102 - 108 | - S6DERLIN ET AL., NAT. BIOTECH., (2000), vol. 18, pages 852 - 856 | - KNAPPIK ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2000), vol. 296, page 57 | - KREBS ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2001), vol. 254, page 67 | - REMINGTON'S PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, MACK PUB. CO., (1990), pages 484 - 528 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MAACK PUBLISHING CO | - RIVA ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (1999), vol. 5, pages 3275S - 3280S | - WONG ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2000), vol. 6, pages 3855 - 3863 | - WAGNER ET AL., J. NUCLEAR MED., (2002), vol. 43, pages 267 - 272 | - ENDOCRINOLGY, (2008), vol. 149, no. 8, pages 3952 - 3959 | - LABORATORY ANIMAL SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 48, pages 64 - 68 | - ENDOCRINOLOGY, (2009), vol. 149, no. 8, pages 3952 - 3959 | - MARKS ET AL., METHODS MOL BIOL., (2004), vol. 248, pages 161 - 76 | - METHODS MOL BIOL., (2004), vol. 248, pages 161 - 76 | - BMC BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2007), vol. 7, page 65 | - TIMMERMAN ET AL., J. MOL. RECOGNIT., (2007), vol. 20, pages 283 - 99 | - SLOOTSTRA ET AL., MOLECULAR DIVERSITY, (1996), vol. 1, pages 87 - 96 | - "Expressing complex relationships in two dimensions", GOWER, DIGBY, Interpreting Multivariate Data, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1981), pages 83 - 118 |