EP2363160 - Inductively coupled injector faceplate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mallinckrodt LLC 675 McDonnell Boulevard Hazelwood, MO 63042 / US | [2011/38] |
Former [2011/36] | For all designated states MALLINCKRODT, INC. 675 McDonnell Boulevard Hazelwood, MO 63042 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neer, Charles 30 E. Central Parkway 301 Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45202 / US | [2011/36] | Representative(s) | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [2013/38] |
Former [2011/36] | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 11168664.8 | 03.12.2009 | [2011/36] | Priority number, date | US20080120100P | 05.12.2008 Original published format: US 120100 P | [2011/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2363160 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2363160 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2363160 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/20, A61M5/145 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
A61M5/14546 (EP,US);
A61M5/007 (EP,US);
A61B6/548 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14553 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3368 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3569 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3592 (EP,US);
A61M2205/6054 (EP,US);
A61M2205/8243 (EP,US);
A61M5/445 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/36] | Title | German: | Induktiv gekoppelte Injektorblende | [2011/36] | English: | Inductively coupled injector faceplate | [2011/36] | French: | Dalle d'injecteur couplée inductivement | [2011/36] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/36] | 20.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09764966.9 / EP2331173 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090764966) is 30.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.12.2009 | AT | 18.09.2013 | BE | 18.09.2013 | BG | 18.09.2013 | CY | 18.09.2013 | CZ | 18.09.2013 | DK | 18.09.2013 | EE | 18.09.2013 | FI | 18.09.2013 | HR | 18.09.2013 | LT | 18.09.2013 | LV | 18.09.2013 | MC | 18.09.2013 | MK | 18.09.2013 | MT | 18.09.2013 | NL | 18.09.2013 | PL | 18.09.2013 | RO | 18.09.2013 | SE | 18.09.2013 | SI | 18.09.2013 | SK | 18.09.2013 | SM | 18.09.2013 | TR | 18.09.2013 | IE | 03.12.2013 | LU | 03.12.2013 | NO | 18.12.2013 | GR | 19.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | IS | 18.01.2014 | PT | 20.01.2014 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 03.12.2009 | |
AT | 18.09.2013 | ||
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
BG | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
MK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
SM | 18.09.2013 | ||
TR | 18.09.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
MK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
SM | 18.09.2013 | ||
TR | 18.09.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
SM | 18.09.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | BE | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 18.09.2013 | |
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 18.09.2013 | |
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 18.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5814900 (ESSER ALBERT [US], et al) [Y] 1-8,10,13-16* figure 8 *; | [A]US6159183 (NEER CHARLES S [US], et al) [A] 1-8,10,13-16 * column 12, line 65 - column 13, line 30; figure 8 * * column 19, lines 7-23 *; | [Y]DE10359735 (DRAEGER MEDICAL AG [DE]) [Y] 1-8,10,13-16 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]US2006079765 (NEER CHARLES S [US], et al) [Y] 1-8,10,13-16 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0039] * |