EP2397825 - Bolometer type terahertz wave detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2011/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURASHINA, Seiji NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 02 /
ODA, Naoki NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | 01 /
KURASHINA, Seiji NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | ||
02 /
ODA, Naoki NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Representative(s) | Reeve, Nicholas Edward Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | Reeve, Nicholas Edward Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 11168670.5 | 03.06.2011 | [2011/51] | Priority number, date | JP20100136499 | 15.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010136499 | [2011/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2397825 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01J5/02, G01J5/08, G01J5/20, H01L27/146 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
G01J5/20 (EP,US);
G01J5/02 (EP,US);
G01J5/023 (EP,US);
G01J5/024 (EP,US);
G01J5/08 (EP,US);
G01J5/0853 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bolometerartiger Terahertz-Wellendetektor | [2011/51] | English: | Bolometer type terahertz wave detector | [2011/51] | French: | Détecteur d'ondes térahertz de type bolomètre | [2011/51] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 11.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.02.2019 | 21.02.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/04] | 03.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.08.2013 | 30.06.2019 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005116169 (TOHYAMA SHIGERU [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0025] , [0064] , [0068]; figures 2a-2c * [I] 7; | [Y]US6552344 (SONE TAKANORI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0039] , [0 58] , [0 59] , [0 69]; figures 6, 9 *; | [Y]US2008237467 (ODA NAOKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * | by applicant | - ODA ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, (2008), vol. 6940, pages 69402Y - 1,69402Y-12 |