EP2372990 - Mobile terminal with ergonomic imaging functions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2016/51] |
Former [2016/24] | For all designated states SnapTrack, Inc. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | ||
Former [2015/49] | For all designated states Sony Mobile Communications AB 221 88 Lund / SE | ||
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB Nya Vattentornet 221 88 Lund / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kennedy, Peter, J. 233 S. Federal Highway 721 Boca Raton, FL Florida 33432 / US | 02 /
Gray, Laurie, A. 917 Bonhurst Drive Holly Springs, NC North Carolina 25740 / US | 03 /
Hunt, Charles 1024 Blykeford Lane Wake Forrest, NC North Carolina 27587 / US | 04 /
Gibbons, Elisabeth 210 Silver Lining Lane Cary, NC North Carolina 27513 / US | 05 /
Middleton, David, Desmond 141 Brentfield Loop Morrisville, NC North Carolina 27560-6878 / US | 06 /
Cunningham, James 4404 Pickwick Drive Raleigh, NC North Carolina 27613 / US | 07 /
Smith, Stacey 144 Tanworth Lane Shirley, Solihull, West Midlands B904DD / GB | 08 /
Swanson, Amy 1613 Royal Red Trail Apex, NC North Carolina 27502 / US | 09 /
Bates, David, C. 3612 Glashields Way Apex, NC North Carolina 27539 / US | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/40] | 01 /
Kennedy, Peter, J. 233 S. Federal Highway 721 Boca Raton, FL Florida 33432 / US | ||
02 /
Gray, Laurie, A. 917 Bonhurst Drive Holly Springs, NC North Carolina 25740 / US | |||
03 /
Hunt, Charles 1515 Deerberry Lane Wake Forrest, NC North Carolina 27587 / US | |||
04 /
Gibbons, Elisabeth 210 Silver Lining Lane Cary, NC North Carolina 27513 / US | |||
05 /
Middleton, David, Desmond 141 Brentfield Loop Morrisville, NC North Carolina 27560-6878 / US | |||
06 /
Cunningham, James 4404 Pickwick Drive Raleigh, NC North Carolina 27613 / US | |||
07 /
Smith, Stacey 144 Tanworth Lane Shirley, Solihull, West Midlands B904DD / GB | |||
08 /
Swanson, Amy 1613 Royal Red Trail Apex, NC North Carolina 27502 / US | |||
09 /
Bates, David, C. 3612 Glashields Way Apex, NC North Carolina 27539 / US | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/45] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/40] | Charles, Glyndwr, et al Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11168673.9 | 14.07.2004 | [2011/40] | Priority number, date | US20030533550P | 31.12.2003 Original published format: US 533550 P | US20040708410 | 01.03.2004 Original published format: US 708410 | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2372990 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2372990 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2372990 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2372990 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, G06F1/16, H04N7/14, H04N1/00, H04N5/232, H04M1/2745, H04M1/57 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
G06F1/1626 (EP,US);
H04N23/63 (EP,US);
G06F1/1686 (EP,US);
H04B1/38 (EP,US);
H04M1/27475 (EP,US);
H04M1/576 (EP,US);
H04M1/72403 (EP,US);
H04N21/41407 (EP,US);
H04N21/4402 (EP,US);
H04N21/442 (EP,US);
H04N7/142 (EP,US);
H04N7/147 (EP,US);
G06F2200/1614 (EP,US);
H04M1/72427 (EP,US);
H04M1/72439 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/40] | H04M1/725, G06F1/16, H04N7/14, H04N1/00, H04N5/232 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/45] |
Former [2011/40] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Mobiles Endgerät mit Ergonomiebildgebungsfunktionen | [2011/40] | English: | Mobile terminal with ergonomic imaging functions | [2011/40] | French: | Terminal mobile doté de fonctions d'imagerie ergonomiques | [2011/40] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 15.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04756956.1 / EP1716696 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040756956) is 07.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0103406 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 6, line 13 - line 19; figure 1 * * page 8, line 20 - line 30; figure 2 ** page 13, line 16 - line 20 *; | [XI]US2001004269 (SHIBATA JUNICHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0214] - paragraph [0225] * * paragraph [0229] - paragraph [0231] * * paragraph [0236]; figure 9 * * paragraph [0239] - paragraph [0241]; figure 14 * [I] 3,8; | [Y]EP1330124 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0003] *; | [Y]EP1338981 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0025]; figures 4-6 * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0036]; figures 7,8 * |