EP2366414 - Dual chamber and gear pump assembly for a high pressure delivery system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [2016/49] |
Former [2011/38] | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bates, James 15 Mt. Pleasant Road Sparta, NJ New Jersey 07871 / US | 02 /
Banik, Robert 9 W. Maple Ave Long Valley, NJ New Jersey 07853 / US | 03 /
Ginsberg, Barry 501 Lydia Lane Wyckoff, NJ New Jersey 07481 / US | [2011/38] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2018/08] |
Former [2012/09] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Patentanwälte Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2011/38] | von Kreisler, Alek Von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 11169439.4 | 17.07.2009 | [2011/38] | Priority number, date | US20080082053P | 18.07.2008 Original published format: US 82053 P | [2011/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2366414 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2366414 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2366414 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/31, A61M5/142, A61M5/155, F04C2/08, F04C2/14, F04C14/20, A61M5/168, A61M5/20, A61M5/24, A61M5/315, A61M5/48 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
A61M5/14216 (EP,US);
A61M5/14236 (EP,US);
A61M5/1424 (EP,US);
A61M5/14244 (EP,US);
A61M5/155 (EP,US);
F04C14/20 (EP,US);
F04C2/084 (EP,US);
F04C2/14 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3128 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3152 (EP,US);
A61M5/16809 (EP,US);
A61M5/204 (EP,US);
A61M5/2053 (EP,US);
A61M5/24 (EP,US);
A61M5/3146 (EP,US);
A61M5/31535 (EP,US);
A61M5/31585 (EP,US);
A61M5/482 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/14] | A61M5/142, A61M5/155, F04C2/08, F04C2/14, F04C14/20, // A61M5/20, A61M5/315, A61M5/168, A61M5/24, A61M5/48 | ||
Former IPC [2011/38] | A61M5/142, // A61M5/20, A61M5/315 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] |
Former [2011/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Doppelkammer- und Getriebepumpenanordnung für ein Hochdruckinjektionssystem | [2011/38] | English: | Dual chamber and gear pump assembly for a high pressure delivery system | [2011/38] | French: | Ensemble pompe à engrenages et double compartiment pour système d'administration sous haute pression | [2011/38] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 14.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09798312.6 / EP2303362 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090798312) is 13.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.07.2009 | AT | 21.02.2018 | CY | 21.02.2018 | CZ | 21.02.2018 | DK | 21.02.2018 | EE | 21.02.2018 | FI | 21.02.2018 | HR | 21.02.2018 | LT | 21.02.2018 | LV | 21.02.2018 | MC | 21.02.2018 | MK | 21.02.2018 | NL | 21.02.2018 | PL | 21.02.2018 | PT | 21.02.2018 | RO | 21.02.2018 | SE | 21.02.2018 | SI | 21.02.2018 | SK | 21.02.2018 | SM | 21.02.2018 | TR | 21.02.2018 | BG | 21.05.2018 | NO | 21.05.2018 | GR | 22.05.2018 | IS | 21.06.2018 | IE | 17.07.2018 | LU | 17.07.2018 | MT | 17.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 17.07.2009 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
MK | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PT | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
MT | 17.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 17.07.2009 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PT | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
MT | 17.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
MT | 17.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
MT | 17.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO03067091 (HYUN KYUNG-YUL [KR]) [Y] 4 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1363025 (SCHWAEBISCHE HUETTENWERKEGMBH [DE]) [Y] 4* the whole document *; | [XYI]WO2006123329 (MEDINGO LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * page 7, line 29 - page 11, line 28 * * page 14, line 4 - page 15, line 22 * * page 16, line 31 - page 17, line 15 * [Y] 4 [I] 2; | [XYI]US2007244435 (HICKS JEFFREY H [US]) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0012] , [0013] , [0044] , [0048] , [0055] , [0078] * [Y] 4 [I] 2; | [IY]WO2007117967 (MEDRAD INC [US], et al) [I] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0035] - [0038] - [0041] , [0043] , [0050] - [0052] * [Y] 4; | [XI] - "Gear pump", (20050206), URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/File:Gear_pump.png, (20120216), XP002669938 [X] 1,3 * the whole document * [I] 2,4 | by applicant | US6494865 | US6569143 | WO2005025641 | US2005065472 |