EP2532290 - Suspension device and seasoning [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2012/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stokoe, Ian In der Grub 1 78343 Gaienhofen / DE | 02 /
Luke, Patrick Brüelstrasse 16 78462 Konstanz / DE | 03 /
Hartenberger, Bernd Am Bisberg 1 78250 Tengen-Watterdingen / DE | 04 /
McLeod, Chastity Prince Hegaustrasse 27 78224 Singen / DE | 05 /
Gibson, Paul Michael 1 Alderdale Close Heaton Moor, SK4 4AT Stockport / GB | [2012/50] | Application number, filing date | 11169619.1 | 10.06.2011 | [2012/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2532290 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A47J43/18 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
A47J43/18 (EP,US);
B65D63/1027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Aufhängungsvorrichtung und Würzmittel | [2012/50] | English: | Suspension device and seasoning | [2012/50] | French: | Dispositif de suspension et assaisonnement | [2012/50] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4896011 (TRUCKS JOE [US]) [I] 1-4,6-8,11-15* column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 29; figure - *; | [I]US5008508 (SKERKER ROBERT B [US], et al) [I] 1-4,6-8,11-15 * column 2, line 54 - column 4, line 12; figure - *; | [I]US7040219 (D AMATO JIM [US], et al) [I] 1,3,4,6-8,11-15 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 64; figure - *; | [I]US2007039484 (LEIBOWITZ MARC [US]) [I] 1,3,4,6-8,11-15 * paragraphs [0019] - [0028]; figure - * |