EP2409738 - Glove with tensioned palm [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 12.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McCrane, Inc. 801 Chadbourne Road Suite 103 Fairfield CA California 94534 / US | [2012/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCrane, David Patrick 801 Chadbourne Road Suite 103 Fairfield California, CA California 94534 / US | [2012/04] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2012/04] | Merrifield, Sarah Elizabeth Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 11169679.5 | 13.06.2011 | [2012/04] | Priority number, date | US20100842411 | 23.07.2010 Original published format: US 842411 | [2012/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2409738 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2409738 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A63B71/14, // A63B23/12, A63B21/06 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
A63B71/141 (EP,US);
A63B21/4019 (EP,US);
A63B21/4035 (EP,US);
A63B21/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Handschuh mit gespannter Handfläche | [2012/04] | English: | Glove with tensioned palm | [2012/04] | French: | Gant avec paume tendue | [2012/04] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/16] | 29.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS4959668U (KOZAI KYOJIRO) [A] 1-14 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0658322 (HISATOMI KK [JP]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US2004221365 (FITZGERALD THOMAS [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0023]; figures 2-5 *; | [A]US5740555 (RENEGAR ROBERT M [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-9 *; | [A]WO2009039489 (BAACKE DENNIS R [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US20100842362 |