EP2535866 - Method to detect and indicate inaccuracies in long length imaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa HealthCare Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2012/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Behiels, Gert Agfa HealthCare NV, HE/legal Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2012/51] | Application number, filing date | 11170103.3 | 16.06.2011 | [2012/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2535866 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G06T3/40 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
A61B6/02 (EP,US);
A61B6/5229 (EP,US);
A61B6/5241 (EP,US);
A61B6/5264 (US);
G06T3/4038 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Detektion und Anzeige von Ungenauigkeiten bei der Abbildung grosser Längen | [2012/51] | English: | Method to detect and indicate inaccuracies in long length imaging | [2012/51] | French: | Procédé pour détecter et indiquer les inexactitudes dans une imagerie à grande longueur | [2012/51] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/04] | 21.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006072810 (SCHARLACK RONALD S [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0036] , [ 0042] , [ 0060] * [I] 3,4; | [XI] - XIAOHUI WANG, "Fully automatic and reference-marker-free image stitching method for full-spine and full-leg imaging with computed radiography", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, (20040101), vol. 5368, doi:10.1117/12.536807, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 361 - 369, XP055013126 [X] 1,2 * page 362, line 1 - line 25 * * paragraph [02.3] * * paragraph [0003] * [I] 3,4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.536807 | [I] - SIMON T. SUEN ET AL, "Photographic stitching with optimized object and color matching based on image derivatives", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20070601), vol. 15, no. 12, doi:10.1364/OE.15.007689, ISSN 1094-4087, pages 7689 - 7696, XP055013132 [I] 1-4 * paragraph [04.2] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.15.007689 | [I] - MATTHEW BROWN ET AL, "Automatic Panoramic Image Stitching using Invariant Features", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER VISION, (20070426), vol. 74, no. 1, doi:10.1007/s11263-006-0002-3, ISSN 0920-5691, pages 59 - 73, XP055013133 [I] 1-4 * figures 4, 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11263-006-0002-3 | [XI] - JONATHAN CHAPPELOW ET AL, "HistoStitcher : An interactive program for accurate and rapid reconstruction of digitized whole histological sections from tissue fragments", COMPUTERIZED MEDICAL IMAGING AND GRAPHICS, (20110311), vol. 35, no. 7-8, doi:10.1016/j.compmedimag.2011.01.010, ISSN 0895-6111, pages 557 - 567, XP055013092 [X] 1,4 * paragraph [03.7] * * tables 2, 3 * [I] 2,3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.compmedimag.2011.01.010 | [A] - JIAYA JIA ET AL, "Image Stitching Using Structure Deformation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (20080401), vol. 30, no. 4, doi:10.1109/TPAMI.2007.70729, ISSN 0162-8828, pages 617 - 631, XP055013220 [A] 1-4 * figures 17, 18 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAMI.2007.70729 | by applicant | EP0919856 | EP0866342 |