EP2397619 - System of self supporting masonry walls and building procedure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geo-Hidrol, S.A. C/ Ingeniero Fernández Casado 1 28820 Coslada (Madrid) / ES | For all designated states Torho, S.A. Veïnat de Sant Vinceç, 1 08490 Tordera Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | For all designated states Geo-Hidrol, S.A. Ingeniero Fernández Casado, 1 28820 Coslada Madrid / ES | ||
For all designated states Torho, S.A. Veïnat de Sant Vinceç, 1 08490 Tordera Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adell López, Luis GEO-HIDROL, S.A. Ingeniero Fernandez Casado,1 28820 Coslada (Madrid) / ES | 02 /
Serra Armangué, Manuel TORHO, S.A. Veïnat de Sant Vicenç, 1 08490 Tordera (Barcelona) / ES | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel 21, 2[deg] 28010 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel 21, 2[deg] 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 11170144.7 | 16.06.2011 | [2011/51] | Priority number, date | ES20100030933 | 16.06.2010 Original published format: ES 201030933 | [2011/51] | Previously filed application, date | ES20100030933 | 16.06.2010 | [2011/51] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2397619 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E04C1/39, E04B2/20, E04B2/48 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
E04B2/20 (EP,ES);
E04B2/48 (EP,ES);
E04B2002/0206 (EP);
E04B2002/0247 (EP);
E04B2002/0254 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System aus selbsttragenden Mauerwerkswänden und Bauverfahren | [2011/51] | English: | System of self supporting masonry walls and building procedure | [2011/51] | French: | Système de murs de maçonnerie autoportants et procédure de construction | [2011/51] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 21.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/22] | 24.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2013 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2106177 (HULTQUIST VICTOR J); | [A]US2929238 (KAYE KARL H); | [A]EP0340840 (BEKAERT SA NV [BE]); | [IA]DE29606867U (REUSING DIETER [DE]); | [A]US2007245660 (SCOTT ROBERT E [US], et al) | by applicant | ES2061377 |