EP2535317 - Biological clarifying device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATB Umwelttechnologien GmbH Südstrasse 2 32457 Porta Westfalica / DE | [2012/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zelmer, Torsten Im Winkel 4 31749 Auetal / DE | 02 /
Vogt, Torsten Am Buchenring 14 31710 Buchholz / DE | [2012/51] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2012/51] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 11170295.7 | 17.06.2011 | [2012/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2535317 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2535317 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/00, C02F3/12, C02F3/22, F16K31/08, F16K31/20 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
C02F3/006 (EP);
C02F3/1242 (EP);
C02F3/1263 (EP);
C02F3/223 (EP);
F16K31/084 (EP);
F16K31/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/51] | Title | German: | Biologische Klärvorrichtung | [2012/51] | English: | Biological clarifying device | [2012/51] | French: | Dispositif de clarification biologique | [2012/51] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 30.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.06.2011 | AL | 24.09.2014 | BG | 24.09.2014 | CY | 24.09.2014 | CZ | 24.09.2014 | EE | 24.09.2014 | LT | 24.09.2014 | LV | 24.09.2014 | MC | 24.09.2014 | MK | 24.09.2014 | MT | 24.09.2014 | NL | 24.09.2014 | RS | 24.09.2014 | SK | 24.09.2014 | SM | 24.09.2014 | TR | 24.09.2014 | IS | 24.01.2015 | PT | 26.01.2015 | LU | 17.06.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 17.06.2011 | |
BG | 24.09.2014 | ||
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
MK | 24.09.2014 | ||
MT | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
SM | 24.09.2014 | ||
TR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 17.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 17.06.2011 | |
BG | 24.09.2014 | ||
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
MT | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
SM | 24.09.2014 | ||
TR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 17.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
MT | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 17.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 17.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 24.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102008033293 (PRAEDEL BIRGIT [DE]) [X] 1,2,13,17 * figures 1,3 * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0107] * [I] 3-12,14-16; | [A]US2002139739 (TYLLILA PEKKA [FI]) [A] 5,6 * figure 1 * | by applicant | EP2098487 |