EP2447356 - Eukaryotic microorganisms for producing lipids and antioxidants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM Nutritional Products AG Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | [2016/16] |
Former [2014/21] | For all designated states DSM Nutritional Products AG Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | ||
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states Ocean Nutrition Canada Limited 101 Research Drive Dartmouth Nova Scotia B2Y 4T6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burja, Adam M. 675 Waverley Street Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 02 /
Radianingtyas, Helia 12635 El Camino Real, Apt. 4201 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 03 /
Barrow, Colin, James 404 Francklyn Street Halifax, Nova Scotia B3H 1A8 / CA | 04 /
Windust, Anthony, James P.O. Box 51 6740 Rideau Valley Drive South Kars, Ontario K0A 2E0 / CA | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Leißler-Gerstl, Gabriele Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | Leissler-Gerstl, Gabriele Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/18] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Neuer Zollhof 2 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 11170447.4 | 07.06.2006 | [2012/18] | Priority number, date | US20050688207P | 07.06.2005 Original published format: US 688207 P | US20050751401P | 16.12.2005 Original published format: US 751401 P | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2447356 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2447356 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/14, A23K10/00, A23L29/00, A23L29/269, A23L33/10, A23L33/115 | [2016/14] | CPC: |
A21D8/04 (EP,US);
C12N1/145 (CN);
C12P7/6434 (EP,CN,US);
A23K10/18 (EP,US);
A23K20/158 (EP,US);
A23L29/065 (EP,US);
A23L33/115 (EP,US);
A23L33/12 (EP,US);
A23L33/135 (EP,US);
A23P10/30 (EP,US);
A61K31/20 (EP,CN,US);
A61K9/4875 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C12N1/00 (US);
C12P7/6409 (CN);
C12P7/6427 (EP,CN,US);
C12P7/6432 (EP,CN,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/3262, A23V2200/332, A23V2200/328, A23V2200/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/18] | C12N1/14, A23K1/00, A23K1/16, A23L1/03, A23L1/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/16] |
Former [2012/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Eukaryotische Mikroorganismen zur Herstellung von Lipiden und Antioxidantien | [2012/18] | English: | Eukaryotic microorganisms for producing lipids and antioxidants | [2012/18] | French: | Micro-organismes eucaryotes pour produire des lipides et des antioxydants | [2012/18] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 04.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06848643.0 / EP1899453 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060848643) is 08.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.06.2006 | AT | 20.04.2016 | BE | 20.04.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | CY | 20.04.2016 | CZ | 20.04.2016 | EE | 20.04.2016 | IS | 20.04.2016 | LT | 20.04.2016 | LV | 20.04.2016 | MC | 20.04.2016 | RO | 20.04.2016 | SE | 20.04.2016 | SI | 20.04.2016 | SK | 20.04.2016 | TR | 20.04.2016 | LU | 07.06.2016 | GR | 21.07.2016 | PT | 22.08.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 07.06.2006 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LU | 07.06.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 07.06.2006 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LU | 07.06.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 07.06.2006 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 20.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5130242 (BARCLAY WILLIAM R [US]); | [XY]EP0823475 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN [JP], et al); | [Y]WO03086104 (OCEAN NUTRITION CANADA LTD [CA]); | [Y]WO2004041251 (OCEAN NUTRITION CANADA LTD [CA], et al); | [E]WO2007068997 (AVESTHA GENGRAINE TECH PVT LTD [IN], et al); | by applicant | US517180 | US3610795 | EP0045665 | US4897355 | US5130242 | US6451567 | US6582941 | US6607900 | US2003193102 | WO2004041251 | US2004161831 |