EP2412237 - Dual-bearing reel drag sound producing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shimano Inc. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [2012/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takamatsu, Takuji C/o Shimano Inc. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8577 / JP | 02 /
Takechi, Kunio C/o Shimano Inc. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8577 / JP | 03 /
Ochiai, Kouji C/o Shimano Inc. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8577 / JP | 04 /
Niitsuma, Akira C/o Shimano Inc. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | Murnane, Graham John Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | Murnane, Graham John Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow Strathclyde G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 11170451.6 | 17.06.2011 | [2012/05] | Priority number, date | JP20100167326 | 26.07.2010 Original published format: JP 2010167326 | [2012/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2412237 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2412237 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01K89/033, A01K89/015 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
A01K89/0179 (EP,US);
A01K89/015 (EP,KR);
A01K89/00 (KR);
A01K89/006 (KR);
A01K89/01 (KR);
A01K89/0111 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung von Doppellagerspulenbremsgeräuschen | [2012/05] | English: | Dual-bearing reel drag sound producing device | [2012/05] | French: | Dispositif de production sonore de traînée de bobine à double revêtement | [2012/05] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 23.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.06.2011 | AL | 31.10.2012 | AT | 31.10.2012 | BE | 31.10.2012 | CY | 31.10.2012 | CZ | 31.10.2012 | DK | 31.10.2012 | EE | 31.10.2012 | FI | 31.10.2012 | HR | 31.10.2012 | IT | 31.10.2012 | LT | 31.10.2012 | LV | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | MK | 31.10.2012 | MT | 31.10.2012 | NL | 31.10.2012 | PL | 31.10.2012 | RO | 31.10.2012 | RS | 31.10.2012 | SE | 31.10.2012 | SI | 31.10.2012 | SK | 31.10.2012 | SM | 31.10.2012 | TR | 31.10.2012 | BG | 31.01.2013 | NO | 31.01.2013 | GR | 01.02.2013 | ES | 11.02.2013 | IS | 28.02.2013 | PT | 28.02.2013 | IE | 17.06.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 17.06.2011 | |
AT | 31.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
MK | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
RS | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
SM | 31.10.2012 | ||
TR | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
IE | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
MK | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
RS | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
SM | 31.10.2012 | ||
TR | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
IE | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
RS | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
SM | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
IE | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
RS | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
IE | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
RS | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
IE | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
RS | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
RS | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
RS | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
RS | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RS | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RS | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/32] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RS | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 31.10.2012 | |
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 31.10.2012 | |
NO | 31.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2347650 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [E] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [XP]US2011011968 (IKUTA TAKESHI [JP]) [XP] 1-7 * paragraph [0040]; figure 5 *; | [X]US2005006512 (MORIMOTO SHINICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * figure 5 *; | [X]US2008173745 (TAKECHI KUNIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * figure 9 *; | [X]EP2119349 (SHIMANO COMPONENTS MY SDN BHD [MY]) [X] 1-7 * figure 5 *; | [X]US2006169813 (NAKAGAWA SHOUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * figure 5 *; | [A]EP2143328 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0081]; figure 4 * | by applicant | JP2010167326 | JP2535459Y |