EP2535516 - Method for friction soldering blades to an axial compressor drum, and corresponding device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Techspace Aero S.A. Route de Liers 121 4041 Herstal (Milmort) / BE | [2012/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wlasowski, Michel rue de Liège, 41 4800 Verviers / BE | [2012/51] | Representative(s) | Lecomte, Didier, et al Lecomte & Partners P.O. Box 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | [2012/51] | Application number, filing date | 11170460.7 | 17.06.2011 | [2012/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2535516 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2535516 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/30, F01D5/34, B23K20/12 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
F01D5/3061 (EP,US);
B23K20/12 (EP,US);
B23K20/129 (EP,US);
F01D5/34 (EP,US);
B23K2101/001 (EP,US);
F05B2230/239 (EP,US);
F05D2230/232 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/51] | Title | German: | Reibschweißverfahren von Laufradschaufeln für die Rotortrommel eines Axialkompressors, und entsprechende Vorrichtung | [2012/51] | English: | Method for friction soldering blades to an axial compressor drum, and corresponding device | [2012/51] | French: | Procédé de soudage par friction d'aubes à un tambour de compresseur axial et dispositif correspondant | [2012/51] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 18.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.06.2011 | AL | 26.02.2014 | AT | 26.02.2014 | BG | 26.02.2014 | CY | 26.02.2014 | CZ | 26.02.2014 | DK | 26.02.2014 | EE | 26.02.2014 | ES | 26.02.2014 | FI | 26.02.2014 | HR | 26.02.2014 | IT | 26.02.2014 | LT | 26.02.2014 | LV | 26.02.2014 | MC | 26.02.2014 | MK | 26.02.2014 | MT | 26.02.2014 | NL | 26.02.2014 | PL | 26.02.2014 | RO | 26.02.2014 | RS | 26.02.2014 | SE | 26.02.2014 | SI | 26.02.2014 | SK | 26.02.2014 | SM | 26.02.2014 | TR | 26.02.2014 | NO | 26.05.2014 | GR | 27.05.2014 | IE | 17.06.2014 | LU | 17.06.2014 | IS | 26.06.2014 | PT | 26.06.2014 | CH | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 17.06.2011 | |
AT | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MK | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
RS | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
TR | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IE | 17.06.2014 | ||
LU | 17.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 17.06.2011 | |
AT | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
RS | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
TR | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IE | 17.06.2014 | ||
LU | 17.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 17.06.2011 | |
AT | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
RS | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IE | 17.06.2014 | ||
LU | 17.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
RS | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IE | 17.06.2014 | ||
LU | 17.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IE | 17.06.2014 | ||
LU | 17.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IE | 17.06.2014 | ||
LU | 17.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IE | 17.06.2014 | ||
LU | 17.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IE | 17.06.2014 | ||
LU | 17.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IE | 17.06.2014 | ||
LU | 17.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
LU | 17.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
LU | 17.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
LU | 17.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 26.02.2014 | |
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDAY]EP2281653 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [XD] 1 * paragraphs [0015] , [0029] , [0042]; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-4,8-15 [Y] 5-7; | [XY]EP0404531 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,8,11,15 * column 1, line 19 - column 1, line 27 * * column 2, line 5 - column 2, line 8 * * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 12 * * claim 1 * [Y] 12-14; | [XI]US5813593 (GALASKE JR LAWRENCE J [US]) [X] 1,9,10 * column 1, line 44 - column 1, line 63 * * column 4, line 25 - column 4, line 40 * * column 5, line 8 - column 5, line 48 * [I] 2; | [YA]EP0397387 (ALLWOOD SEARLE & TIMNEY [GB]) [Y] 5-7,12-14 * column 5, line 33 - column 6, line 1 * * column 9, line 5 - column 9, line 43 * * column 10, line 23 - column 10, line 50 * * column 13, line 9 - column 13, line 32; figures 2-4,7 * [A] 1,11; | [A]EP2204541 (TECHSPACE AERO SA [BE]) [A] 1,2,11 * figure 2 * | by applicant | US2003201305 | EP2281653 |