EP2371675 - Electric power steering device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiina, Akihiko c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 02 /
Shinto, Hiroaki c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 03 /
Minami, Mitsuharu c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 04 /
Okawa, Noritake c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 05 /
Sakuda, Masayoshi c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2012/21] |
Former [2011/40] | 01 /
Shiina, Akihiko c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | ||
02 /
Shinto, Hiroaki c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | |||
03 /
Minami, Mitsuharu c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | |||
04 /
Okawa, Noritake c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | |||
05 /
Sakuda, Masayoshi c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | de Beaumont, Michel 1bis, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2011/40] | Application number, filing date | 11170816.0 | 16.04.2004 | [2011/40] | Priority number, date | JP20030114020 | 18.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003114020 | JP20030114018 | 18.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003114018 | JP20030118168 | 23.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003118168 | JP20030118167 | 23.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003118167 | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2371675 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2371675 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/04, F16H1/16 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
F16H1/16 (EP,US);
B62D5/0409 (EP,US);
F16C25/08 (EP,US);
H02K7/081 (EP,US);
F16C2361/61 (EP,US);
F16C2380/27 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/40] | B62D5/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/40] | Title | German: | Elektrische Servolenkung | [2011/40] | English: | Electric power steering device | [2011/40] | French: | Dispositif de direction assistée électrique | [2011/40] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 24.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04728046.6 / EP1623908 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040728046) is 01.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 16.04.2013 | [2014/09] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2317490 (GLENN SIMPSON EMORY) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5605071 (BUCHANAN JR HARRY C [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * * column 2, line 30 - line 36 ** column 4, line 25 - line 30 *; | [A]DE19603270 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 11 - column 6, line 20; figure 2 *; | [A]US2002053249 (JAMMER TODD F [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1447305 (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP]) [E] 1,2 * the whole document * * abstract *; | [E]EP1452419 (NSK LTD [JP]) [E] 1,2 * the whole document * * sentence 48; figures 1,2A * | by applicant | JPH1143062 | JP2002021943 |