EP2537544 - Needle assembly storage device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 11170826.9 | 21.06.2011 | [2012/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2537544 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/00, B65D83/02 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
A61M5/002 (EP,US);
B65D85/24 (EP,US);
A61M2205/581 (EP,US);
A61M2205/582 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Aufbewahrungsgerät für eine Nadelvorrichtung | [2012/52] | English: | Needle assembly storage device | [2012/52] | French: | Dispositif de stockage d'un ensemble formant aiguille | [2012/52] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2013/31] | 29.01.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IAY]US5590774 (ROBERTS HOLLY H [US]) [I] 9-11 * figure 1 * * column 1, lines 6-7 * * column 2, lines 48-60 * * column 3, lines 48-50 * * column 4, lines 10-17 * * column 6, lines 9-10,15-18 * [A] 1-8 [Y] 12; | [YDA]WO0211798 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [YD] 12 * figure 1 * * page 1, lines 18-28 * * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 5 * * page 4, lines 14-19 * [A] 1-11; | [AD]US5873462 (NGUYEN TUAN V [US], et al) [AD] 1-12 * figures 2,5 * * column 2, lines 35-59 *; | [A]WO02100465 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 1-12 * figure 3 * * page 3, lines 8-13 * * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 4 * | by applicant | US7134550 | US5873462 | WO2009136193 |