EP2399541 - Dental structure and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hähnel, Bernd Fliederweg 7 83242 Reit im Winkl / DE | [2011/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | Grosse, Felix Christopher Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Straße 14 80335 München / DE | [2011/52] | Application number, filing date | 11171018.2 | 22.06.2011 | [2011/52] | Priority number, date | DE20101024756 | 23.06.2010 Original published format: DE102010024756 | [2011/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2399541 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2399541 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61C5/08, A61C5/10 | [2014/27] | CPC: |
A61C5/77 (EP,US);
A61C5/30 (EP,US);
A61C5/70 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/52] | A61C5/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2011/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Zahntechnischer Aufbau und Verfahren zur Herstellung desselben | [2011/52] | English: | Dental structure and method for manufacturing the same | [2011/52] | French: | Structure dentaire et son procédé de fabrication | [2011/52] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 01.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.07.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.06.2011 | AL | 12.08.2015 | BG | 12.08.2015 | CY | 12.08.2015 | CZ | 12.08.2015 | DK | 12.08.2015 | EE | 12.08.2015 | ES | 12.08.2015 | FI | 12.08.2015 | HR | 12.08.2015 | IT | 12.08.2015 | LT | 12.08.2015 | LV | 12.08.2015 | MC | 12.08.2015 | MK | 12.08.2015 | MT | 12.08.2015 | NL | 12.08.2015 | PL | 12.08.2015 | RO | 12.08.2015 | RS | 12.08.2015 | SE | 12.08.2015 | SI | 12.08.2015 | SK | 12.08.2015 | SM | 12.08.2015 | TR | 12.08.2015 | NO | 12.11.2015 | GR | 13.11.2015 | IS | 12.12.2015 | PT | 14.12.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 22.06.2011 | |
BG | 12.08.2015 | ||
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MK | 12.08.2015 | ||
MT | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
SM | 12.08.2015 | ||
TR | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MK | 12.08.2015 | ||
MT | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
SM | 12.08.2015 | ||
TR | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
SM | 12.08.2015 | ||
TR | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
SM | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | DK | 12.08.2015 | |
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 12.08.2015 | |
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | ES | 12.08.2015 | |
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 12.08.2015 | |
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 12.08.2015 | |
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 12.08.2015 | |
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 12.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0252412 (KOLLER WERNER) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * column 3 - column 7; figures 10, 16-18 * [A] 7-9; | [IAY]WO02069834 (CARBOTECH [FR], et al) [I] 1,2,5,6 * page 6 - page 9; figures 4, 6, 7, 13 * [A] 7-9 [Y] 1-3,5,6; | [A]DE828284 (LUDWIG KOEHLER DR MED) [A] 1-9 * page 1 - page 2 * | Examination | DE102007014458 | DE19508771 |