EP2385672 - Determining a channel matrix by measuring interference [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2015 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/34] |
Former [2011/45] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, Avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kramer, Gerhard Fischer-von-Erlach Str. 3a 80689 Munich / DE | 02 /
Whiting, Philip 174 Union Avenue New Providence, NJ New Jersey 07974 / US | 03 /
Zivkovic, Miroslav Leplaan 43a 's-Gravenhage 2565 LD Den Haag / NL | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Nokia Bell Patent Attorneys Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerp / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | ALU Antw Patent Attorneys Intellectual Property and Standards Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerp / BE | Application number, filing date | 11171128.9 | 01.04.2008 | [2011/45] | Priority number, date | US20070922703P | 09.04.2007 Original published format: US 922703 P | US20070897877 | 31.08.2007 Original published format: US 897877 | [2011/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2385672 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2385672 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2385672 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26, H04L25/03, H04L25/02, H04J14/02, H04B17/00, H04B7/06, H04B7/04, H04L5/00 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
H04L25/0204 (EP,US);
H04L25/03 (KR);
H04B17/318 (EP,US);
H04B17/345 (EP,US);
H04B7/0417 (EP,US);
H04B7/0632 (EP,US);
H04J14/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04L25/0224 (EP,US);
H04L25/03343 (EP,US);
H04L27/26 (KR);
H04L5/0023 (EP,US);
H04M3/34 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/45] | Title | German: | Bestimmung einer Kanalmatrix durch Störungsmessung | [2014/21] | English: | Determining a channel matrix by measuring interference | [2011/45] | French: | Détermination d'une matrice de canal par mesure de l'interférence | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/45] | Bestimmung einer kanalmatrix Durch Störungsmessung | Examination procedure | 22.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 02.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08727240.7 / EP2156632 | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/40] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | ||
Date: | 10.04.2013 | ||
[2014/47] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.04.2008 | AT | 01.10.2014 | BE | 01.10.2014 | BG | 01.10.2014 | CY | 01.10.2014 | CZ | 01.10.2014 | DK | 01.10.2014 | EE | 01.10.2014 | ES | 01.10.2014 | FI | 01.10.2014 | HR | 01.10.2014 | IT | 01.10.2014 | LT | 01.10.2014 | LV | 01.10.2014 | MC | 01.10.2014 | MT | 01.10.2014 | NL | 01.10.2014 | PL | 01.10.2014 | RO | 01.10.2014 | SE | 01.10.2014 | SI | 01.10.2014 | SK | 01.10.2014 | TR | 01.10.2014 | NO | 01.01.2015 | GR | 02.01.2015 | IS | 01.02.2015 | PT | 02.02.2015 | IE | 01.04.2015 | LU | 01.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 01.04.2008 | |
AT | 01.10.2014 | ||
BG | 01.10.2014 | ||
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
MT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
TR | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 01.04.2015 | ||
LU | 01.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
MT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 01.04.2015 | ||
LU | 01.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 01.04.2015 | ||
LU | 01.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CZ | 01.10.2014 | |
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CZ | 01.10.2014 | |
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 01.10.2014 | |
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 01.10.2014 | |
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 01.10.2014 | |
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 01.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003210750 (ONGGOSANUSI EKO N [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0041] *; | [A] - KIHONG KIM ET AL, "Interference Mitigation in MIMO Systems by Subset Antenna Transmission", WIRELESS PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20060809), vol. 40, no. 3, ISSN 1572-834X, pages 305 - 315, XP019468831 [A] 1-8 * page 305 - page 307 * | [A] - CENDRILLON R ET AL, "Partial crosstalk precompensation in downstream VDSL", SIGNAL PROCESSING, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (20041101), vol. 84, no. 11, ISSN 0165-1684, pages 2005 - 2019, XP004591296 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.sigpro.2004.07.013 | [A] - WEBB M ET AL, "Matrix structure and capacity bounds of MIMO channels in interference", IEE PROCEEDINGS : COMMUNICATIONS, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, GB, (20060803), vol. 153, no. 4, ISSN 1350-2425, pages 476 - 481, XP006026764 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PALOMAR D P ET AL, "Optimum joint transmit-receive linear processing for vectored DSL transmission with QoS requirements", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 36TH. ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON SIGNALS, SYSTEMS, & COMPUTERS. PACIFIC GROOVE, CA, NOV. 3 - 6, 2002; [ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON SIGNALS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTERS], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20021103), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-7576-5, pages 388 - 392, XP010638237 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.2002.1197212 | by applicant | US20060795369 | US20070922703 | US20070796366 |