EP2390390 - Condenser frame in a Stretching unit for stretching a fibrous strip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Klosterstrasse 20 8406 Winterthur / CH | [2011/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stahlecker, Gerd Auf der Ebene 30 73054 Eislingen/Fils / DE | [2011/48] | Representative(s) | Bergmeier, Werner, et al Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Friedrich-Ebert-Straße 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | Bergmeier, Werner, et al Canzler & Bergmeier Friedrich-Ebert-Straße 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 11172059.5 | 10.07.2008 | [2011/48] | Priority number, date | DE20071049337 | 12.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007049337 | [2011/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2390390 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2390390 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | D01H5/26, D01H5/72 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
D01H5/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/48] | Title | German: | Verdichterrahmen in einem Streckwerk zum Verziehen eines Faserbandes | [2011/48] | English: | Condenser frame in a Stretching unit for stretching a fibrous strip | [2011/48] | French: | Cadre de condensateur d'une unité d'étirage pour ruban de fibres | [2011/48] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 27.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08012457.1 / EP2048269 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080012457) is 30.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.07.2008 | CY | 06.03.2013 | CZ | 06.03.2013 | DK | 06.03.2013 | EE | 06.03.2013 | FI | 06.03.2013 | HR | 06.03.2013 | IT | 06.03.2013 | LT | 06.03.2013 | LV | 06.03.2013 | MC | 06.03.2013 | MT | 06.03.2013 | NL | 06.03.2013 | PL | 06.03.2013 | RO | 06.03.2013 | SE | 06.03.2013 | SI | 06.03.2013 | SK | 06.03.2013 | BG | 06.06.2013 | NO | 06.06.2013 | GR | 07.06.2013 | ES | 17.06.2013 | IS | 06.07.2013 | PT | 08.07.2013 | AT | 10.07.2013 | GB | 10.07.2013 | IE | 10.07.2013 | LU | 10.07.2013 | BE | 31.07.2013 | FR | 31.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
MT | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
GB | 10.07.2013 | ||
IE | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
GB | 10.07.2013 | ||
IE | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | CZ | 06.03.2013 | |
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
GB | 10.07.2013 | ||
IE | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CZ | 06.03.2013 | |
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
GB | 10.07.2013 | ||
IE | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CZ | 06.03.2013 | |
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
GB | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CZ | 06.03.2013 | |
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
GB | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CZ | 06.03.2013 | |
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
GB | 10.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CZ | 06.03.2013 | |
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CZ | 06.03.2013 | |
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CZ | 06.03.2013 | |
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | CZ | 06.03.2013 | |
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 06.03.2013 | |
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | EE | 06.03.2013 | |
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | FI | 06.03.2013 | |
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 06.03.2013 | |
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 06.03.2013 | |
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 06.03.2013 | |
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 06.03.2013 | |
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 06.03.2013 | |
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 06.03.2013 | |
NO | 06.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2006005207 (HOLDING FUER INDUSTRIEBETEILIG [CH], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7 * page 12, line 4 - page 15, line 23; figures 2-4 * [A] 2,4,6,8; | [E]DE102007024234 (STAHLECKER GMBH WILHELM [DE]) [E] 1 * paragraphs [0016] - [0019]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE10356913 (STAHLECKER GMBH WILHELM [DE]) [A] 1,5,7 * paragraphs [0023] - [0030]; figures 1-7 *; | [AD]DE10346258 (STAHLECKER GMBH WILHELM [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1825759U (SKF KUGELLAGERFABRIKEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,5; claim 1 *; | [A]DE102006006503 (KOENIG REINHARD [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0019]; figures 1,3 * | by applicant | DE10346258 |