EP2541685 - Screen connection terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2013/01] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drehmann, Gennadij Lessingstr. 9 92224 Amberg / DE | [2013/01] | Application number, filing date | 11172155.1 | 30.06.2011 | [2013/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2541685 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2541685 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/48 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
H01R4/4872 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Title | German: | Schirmanschlussklemme | [2013/01] | English: | Screen connection terminal | [2013/01] | French: | Borne de connexion à écran | [2013/01] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 16.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2011 | AL | 25.12.2013 | BG | 25.12.2013 | CY | 25.12.2013 | CZ | 25.12.2013 | DK | 25.12.2013 | EE | 25.12.2013 | ES | 25.12.2013 | FI | 25.12.2013 | HR | 25.12.2013 | LT | 25.12.2013 | LV | 25.12.2013 | MC | 25.12.2013 | MK | 25.12.2013 | MT | 25.12.2013 | NL | 25.12.2013 | PL | 25.12.2013 | RO | 25.12.2013 | RS | 25.12.2013 | SE | 25.12.2013 | SI | 25.12.2013 | SK | 25.12.2013 | SM | 25.12.2013 | TR | 25.12.2013 | NO | 25.03.2014 | GR | 26.03.2014 | IS | 25.04.2014 | PT | 28.04.2014 | BE | 30.06.2014 | CH | 30.06.2014 | IE | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | LU | 30.06.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 30.06.2011 | |
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MK | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
TR | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
BE | 30.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
LU | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 30.06.2011 | |
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
TR | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
BE | 30.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
LU | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 30.06.2011 | |
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
BE | 30.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
LU | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
LU | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
LU | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
LU | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
LU | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
LU | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
LU | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | EE | 25.12.2013 | |
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 25.12.2013 | |
NO | 25.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE29805077U (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE [DE]) [A] 1-7 * figures 1-3 * * page 3, line 7 - page 5, line 7 *; | [AD]EP0334975 (WEIDMUELLER C A GMBH CO [DE]) [AD] 1-7 * figures 1-6 * * column 2, line 7 - column 6, line 34 *; | [A]WO2007053871 (MOELLER GEBAEUDEAUTOMATION GMB [AT], et al) [A] 1-7 * figures 1-4 * * page 4, line 17 - page 9, line 6 *; | [A]DE102007016333 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * figures 1-10 * * abstract * | by applicant | EP0334975 |