EP2541849 - Routing method and routing device for a packet-oriented communication network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd. Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [2013/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dzung, Dacfey Albisstrasse 1 5430 Wettingen / CH | [2013/01] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 11172184.1 | 30.06.2011 | [2013/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2541849 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
H04L45/121 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Routingverfahren und Routingvorrichtung für ein paketorientiertes Kommunikationsnetzwerk | [2013/01] | English: | Routing method and routing device for a packet-oriented communication network | [2013/01] | French: | Procédé dýacheminement et dispositif dýacheminement pour réseau de communication orienté paquets | [2013/01] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/52] | 08.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6226266 (GALAND CLAUDE [FR], et al) [I] 1-13 * column 1, line 45 - column 8, line 46; figures 1,4,5 *; | [I]US2010128703 (BRAND MATTHEW [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * paragraphs [0029] - [0050]; figures 1,2,4A,4B * * paragraphs [0061] - [0074]; figure 5 * | [XI] - ULUDAG S ET AL, "A Laplace Transform-Based Method to Stochastic Path Finding", COMMUNICATIONS, 2009. ICC '09. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090614), ISBN 978-1-4244-3435-0, pages 1 - 5, XP031505593 [X] 1,2,4,7,8,10,13 * Chapters III, IV * [I] 3,5,6,9,11,12 | by applicant | - M. CAMPISTA ET AL., "Routing Metrics and Protocols for Wireless Mesh Networks", IEEE NETWORK, (200801), pages 6 - 12 |