EP2413234 - Method and mobile device enabling simplified enterprise printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2012/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shah, Zarana c/o Ricoh Americas Corporation, US Intellectual Property Office 10460 Bubb Road Cupertino, CA California 95014 / US | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/17] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/05] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11172186.6 | 30.06.2011 | [2012/05] | Priority number, date | US20100845648 | 28.07.2010 Original published format: US 845648 | [2012/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2413234 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2413234 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2413234 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
G06F3/1288 (EP,US);
G06F3/1206 (EP,US);
G06F3/1247 (EP,US);
G06F3/1292 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren und mobile Vorrichtung zur Ermöglichung eines vereinfachten Unternehmensdrucks | [2012/05] | English: | Method and mobile device enabling simplified enterprise printing | [2012/05] | French: | Procédé et dispositif mobile activant une impression d'entreprise simplifiée | [2012/05] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 25.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.12.2017 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2011 | AL | 25.04.2018 | AT | 25.04.2018 | CY | 25.04.2018 | CZ | 25.04.2018 | DK | 25.04.2018 | EE | 25.04.2018 | ES | 25.04.2018 | FI | 25.04.2018 | HR | 25.04.2018 | IT | 25.04.2018 | LT | 25.04.2018 | LV | 25.04.2018 | MC | 25.04.2018 | MK | 25.04.2018 | NL | 25.04.2018 | PL | 25.04.2018 | RO | 25.04.2018 | RS | 25.04.2018 | SE | 25.04.2018 | SI | 25.04.2018 | SK | 25.04.2018 | SM | 25.04.2018 | TR | 25.04.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | IE | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | LU | 30.06.2018 | MT | 30.06.2018 | BG | 25.07.2018 | NO | 25.07.2018 | GR | 26.07.2018 | IS | 25.08.2018 | PT | 27.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 30.06.2011 | |
AL | 25.04.2018 | ||
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
MK | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
IE | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
LU | 30.06.2018 | ||
MT | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 30.06.2011 | |
AL | 25.04.2018 | ||
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
IE | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
LU | 30.06.2018 | ||
MT | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
IE | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
LU | 30.06.2018 | ||
MT | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
IE | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
LU | 30.06.2018 | ||
MT | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
IE | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
LU | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
IE | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
LU | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
IE | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
LU | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
IE | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
LU | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 30.06.2018 | ||
LU | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 25.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6201611 (CARTER KEITH EDWARD [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9-12,14,15 * abstract * * column 2, line 58 - line 63 * * column 3, line 49 - line 50 * * column 4, line 44 - column 7, line 18; figures 3,4 * [I] 5-8,13; | [A]EP1309170 (TOSHIBA TEC KK [JP]) [A] 4,5 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0142] - paragraph [0145] ** paragraph [0161] - paragraph [0163] *; | [A]EP1331549 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-3,7,8 * paragraphs [0005] , [0011] , [0013] - [0016]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP1422609 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1,10,15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0028] *; | [X]WO2006062864 (AIRPRINT NETWORKS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,10,15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2008084578 (WALKER JEFFREY W [US], et al) [X] 1,10,15 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0129] - paragraph [0132]; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US20100845648 |