EP2371681 - Aerodynamic structure for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2015/04] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sumitani, Keiji c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
Nakaya, Hiroyuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
Murayama, Toshiyuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
Takeuchi, Eishi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 05 /
Oda, Kazunori c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2015/04] |
Former [2011/40] | 01 /
Sumitani, Keiji c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
Nakaya, Hiroyuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
03 /
Murayama, Toshiyuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
04 /
Takeuchi, Eishi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
05 /
Oda, Kazunori c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/04] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2011/40] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 11172356.5 | 28.12.2006 | [2011/40] | Priority number, date | JP20060079179 | 22.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006079179 | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2371681 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2371681 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/18, B62D25/16 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
B62D37/02 (EP,KR,US);
B62D25/161 (EP,KR,US);
B62D25/18 (KR);
B62D35/008 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/40] | Title | German: | Aerodynamische Struktur für ein Fahrzeug | [2011/40] | English: | Aerodynamic structure for vehicle | [2011/40] | French: | Structure aérodynamique d'un véhicule | [2011/40] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 23.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06843644.3 / EP2006194 | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.12.2006 | AT | 21.01.2015 | CY | 21.01.2015 | DK | 21.01.2015 | EE | 21.01.2015 | FI | 21.01.2015 | LT | 21.01.2015 | LV | 21.01.2015 | MC | 21.01.2015 | PL | 21.01.2015 | PT | 21.01.2015 | RO | 21.01.2015 | SE | 21.01.2015 | SI | 21.01.2015 | SK | 21.01.2015 | BG | 21.04.2015 | GR | 22.04.2015 | IS | 21.05.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2017/40] | HU | 28.12.2006 | |
AT | 21.01.2015 | ||
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 21.01.2015 | |
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 21.01.2015 | |
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 21.01.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE19540259 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * column 2 - column 3, line 55; figures 1-2 * [I] 3; | [XI]EP0626308 (PARLOK AB OY [FI]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 25; figures 1-4 * [I] 3; | [A]GB2300396 (CRAIG RAYMOND RUSSEL [GB]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-7 *; | [A]WO2005070749 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 2-4 *; | [A]JPH08216929 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2003528772 | JPH08216929 | JPH06144296 | JPH06156327 | JP2006069396 | JP3102386U | JPH10278854 |