EP2388116 - Equipment and method of providing rectangular floor panels with a mechanical locking system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/47] | Equipment for providing rectangular floor panels with a mechanical locking system | ||
[2019/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Välinge Innovation AB Prästavägen 513 263 65 Viken / SE | [2019/31] |
Former [2011/47] | For all designated states Välinge Innovation AB Prästavägen 513 263 65 Viken / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pervan, Darko Bygatan 30 263 61 Viken / SE | 02 /
Nygren, Per Surbrunnsgatan 15 253 60 Ramlösa / SE | 03 /
Håkansson, Niclas Syllstensgatan 19 263 65 Viken / SE | [2011/52] |
Former [2011/47] | 01 /
Pervan, Darko Bygatan 30 263 61 Viken / SE | ||
02 /
Nygren, Per S. Brunnsvägen 62 256 54 Ramlösa / SE | |||
03 /
Håkansson, Niclas Syllstensgatan 19 263 65 Viken / SE | Representative(s) | Välinge Innovation AB Patent Department Prästavägen 513 263 65 Viken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Engstrand, Ola, et al Välinge Innovation AB Patent Department Prästavägen 513 263 65 Viken / SE | ||
Former [2011/47] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 11173146.9 | 21.10.2005 | [2011/47] | Priority number, date | EP20040025167 | 22.10.2004 Original published format: EP 04025167 | [2011/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2388116 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2388116 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2388116 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/02, F16B5/00, B65D69/00, E04G23/00, E04F21/22, E04F15/04, E04B5/00 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
E04F15/02038 (EP,NO,US);
E04F15/02 (KR);
E04B5/00 (US);
E04F15/00 (KR);
E04F21/22 (EP,US);
F16B5/00 (KR);
E04B1/541 (US);
E04B1/5818 (US);
E04F15/04 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0115 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0138 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0146 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0153 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0176 (EP,US);
E04F2201/023 (EP,US);
E04F2201/042 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0523 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0547 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0576 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0582 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0588 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/47] | B27M3/00, B27D5/00, E04F15/02, E04F15/04, E04F21/22, E04G23/00, F16B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/47] | Title | German: | Vorrichrung und Verfahren zum Ausrüsten rechteckiger Bodenpanele mit einem mechanischen Verriegelungssystem | [2019/12] | English: | Equipment and method of providing rectangular floor panels with a mechanical locking system | [2019/12] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour doter des panneaux de plancher rectangulaires avec un système de verrouillage mécanique | [2019/12] |
Former [2011/47] | Anlage zur Anbringung eines mechanischen Verriegelungssystem auf rechteckige Bodenplatten | ||
Former [2011/47] | Equipment for providing rectangular floor panels with a mechanical locking system | ||
Former [2011/47] | Équipement pour fournir un système de verrouillage mécanique à des panneaux de plancher rectangulaires | Examination procedure | 07.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/47] | 19.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05796804.2 / EP1802827 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.10.2005 | CY | 31.07.2019 | DK | 31.07.2019 | EE | 31.07.2019 | ES | 31.07.2019 | FI | 31.07.2019 | IT | 31.07.2019 | LT | 31.07.2019 | LV | 31.07.2019 | MC | 31.07.2019 | RO | 31.07.2019 | SI | 31.07.2019 | SK | 31.07.2019 | IE | 21.10.2019 | LU | 21.10.2019 | IS | 30.10.2019 | BG | 31.10.2019 | GR | 01.11.2019 | PT | 02.12.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | CY | 31.07.2019 | |
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 21.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.10.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | DK | 31.07.2019 | |
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 21.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.10.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | DK | 31.07.2019 | |
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 21.10.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | DK | 31.07.2019 | |
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 21.10.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | DK | 31.07.2019 | |
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 21.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | DK | 31.07.2019 | |
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | DK | 31.07.2019 | |
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | DK | 31.07.2019 | |
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | DK | 31.07.2019 | |
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 31.07.2019 | |
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 31.07.2019 | |
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 31.07.2019 | |
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 31.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO03083234 (VALINGE ALUMINIUM AB [SE], et al) [AD] 1-7 * page 40, line 17 - page 41, line 13; figure 35a * * page 19, line 32 - page 20, line 2 * * page 18, line 33 - page 19, line 1 * * page 24, line 27 - line 34 * * page 31, line 1 - line 2; figures 11a-c * * page 42, line 19 - line 25; claims 14,17 * * page 32, line 22 - page 33, line 1; figures 14a-d * * page 35, line 11 - line 16; figure 18a ** page 33, line 3 - line 5 * | by applicant | WO0248127 | WO03083234 |