EP2412491 - Pivotable bit holder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hazet-Werk Hermann Zerver GmbH & Co. KG Güldenwerther Bahnhofstrasse 25-29 42857 Remscheid / DE | [2012/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Timm, Felix Jahnweg 34 89160 Dornstadt / DE | 02 /
Unseld, Reinhold Gartenweg 25 89176 Asselfingen / DE | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | Ksoll, Peter Bockermann Ksoll Griepenstroh Osterhoff Patentanwälte Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [2015/41] |
Former [2012/05] | Ksoll, Peter Patentanwälte Bockermann, Ksoll, Griepenstroh Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 11173515.5 | 12.07.2011 | [2012/05] | Priority number, date | DE20101032923 | 30.07.2010 Original published format: DE102010032923 | [2012/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2412491 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2412491 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2412491 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B25H3/00, B25H3/02 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
B25H3/003 (EP);
B25H3/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Title | German: | Schwenkbarer Bithalter | [2012/05] | English: | Pivotable bit holder | [2012/05] | French: | Manche porte-embouts à cliquet | [2012/05] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 20.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.07.2011 | AL | 07.10.2015 | BG | 07.10.2015 | CY | 07.10.2015 | CZ | 07.10.2015 | DK | 07.10.2015 | EE | 07.10.2015 | FI | 07.10.2015 | HR | 07.10.2015 | LT | 07.10.2015 | LV | 07.10.2015 | MC | 07.10.2015 | MK | 07.10.2015 | MT | 07.10.2015 | PL | 07.10.2015 | RO | 07.10.2015 | RS | 07.10.2015 | SE | 07.10.2015 | SI | 07.10.2015 | SK | 07.10.2015 | SM | 07.10.2015 | TR | 07.10.2015 | NO | 07.01.2016 | GR | 08.01.2016 | IS | 07.02.2016 | PT | 08.02.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 12.07.2011 | |
BG | 07.10.2015 | ||
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MK | 07.10.2015 | ||
MT | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
TR | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 12.07.2011 | |
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MK | 07.10.2015 | ||
MT | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
TR | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 12.07.2011 | |
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MK | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
TR | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 12.07.2011 | |
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MK | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 07.10.2015 | |
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 07.10.2015 | |
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 07.10.2015 | |
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | LT | 07.10.2015 | |
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 07.10.2015 | |
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 07.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE102008037009 (LAI CHIN-TSAI [TW]) [X] 1-3,6 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1-11 * [Y] 5 [I] 4; | [Y]DE102004036228 (CHEN TSAI-CHING [TW]) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1-11 *; | [A]US2008210593 (CORNWELL W ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1-10 * | by applicant | DE102006055195 |