EP2407116 - Polarity control of electrosurgical generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2017/41] |
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | ||
Former [2012/03] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group, LP Covidien, Energy-based Devices 5920 Longbow Drive Boulder, CO 80301 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keppel, David S. 911 Tulip Street Apt. C Longmont, CO 80501 / US | [2017/41] |
Former [2012/03] | 01 /
Keppel, David S. 911 Tulip Street Apt. C Longmont, CO Colorado 80501 / US | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2017/41] |
Former [2012/03] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11173562.7 | 12.07.2011 | [2012/03] | Priority number, date | US20100834364 | 12.07.2010 Original published format: US 834364 | [2012/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2407116 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2407116 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/12, // A61B18/14 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
A61B18/1206 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00892 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1213 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] |
Former [2012/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Polaritätskontrolle für einen elektrochirurgischen Generator | [2012/03] | English: | Polarity control of electrosurgical generator | [2012/03] | French: | Contrôle de la polarité d'un générateur électrochirurgical | [2012/03] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/35] | 13.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.05.2017 | 04.05.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.07.2011 | AL | 11.10.2017 | AT | 11.10.2017 | CY | 11.10.2017 | CZ | 11.10.2017 | DK | 11.10.2017 | EE | 11.10.2017 | ES | 11.10.2017 | FI | 11.10.2017 | HR | 11.10.2017 | IT | 11.10.2017 | LT | 11.10.2017 | LV | 11.10.2017 | MC | 11.10.2017 | MK | 11.10.2017 | NL | 11.10.2017 | PL | 11.10.2017 | PT | 11.10.2017 | RO | 11.10.2017 | RS | 11.10.2017 | SE | 11.10.2017 | SI | 11.10.2017 | SK | 11.10.2017 | SM | 11.10.2017 | TR | 11.10.2017 | BG | 11.01.2018 | NO | 11.01.2018 | GR | 12.01.2018 | IS | 11.02.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 12.07.2011 | |
AT | 11.10.2017 | ||
CY | 11.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
MK | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PT | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
TR | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 12.07.2011 | |
AT | 11.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PT | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
TR | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
TR | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 11.10.2017 | |
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 11.10.2017 | |
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 11.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS635876 (HITACHI SEIKO KK) [A] 9-20 * abstract *; | [IY]US6547786 (GOBLE COLIN CHARLES OWEN [GB]) [I] 9,10,12,16,18,20 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 17; figure 1 * * column 5, line 34 - column 6, line 43 * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] * * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 11 * * column 7, line 14 - line 20 * [Y] 13-15,17; | [I]US2006219682 (KLETT JOHANNES [DE], et al) [I] 9-12,16,18-20 * column 3, line 27 - line 35; figure 4 * * column 6, line 1 - line 21; figure 1 * * column 7, line 21 - line 46 * * column 4, line 41 - line 51 *; | [Y]EP1849425 (COVIDIEN AG [CH]) [Y] 13-15 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] *; | [Y]EP2025297 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [Y] 17 * paragraph [0045]; figure 11 *; | [A] - MOMOZAKI Y ET AL, "Electrical breakdown experiments with application to alkali metal thermal-to-electric converters", ENERGY CONVERSION AND MANAGEMENT, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, OXFORD, GB, (20030401), vol. 44, no. 6, doi:10.1016/S0196-8904(02)00089-4, ISSN 0196-8904, pages 819 - 843, XP004393006 [A] 9-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0196-8904(02)00089-4 | [A] - ZLATANOVIC M, "Sensors in diffusion plasma processing", MICROELECTRONICS, 1995. PROCEEDINGS., 1995 20TH INTERNATIONAL CONFEREN CE ON NIS, SERBIA 12-14 SEPT. 1995, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19950912), vol. 2, doi:10.1109/ICMEL.1995.500928, ISBN 978-0-7803-2786-3, pages 565 - 570, XP010161741 [A] 9-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICMEL.1995.500928 |