EP2407138 - Hospital bed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/03] | Brake release alarm for hospital bed | ||
[2014/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hill-Rom Services, Inc. 1069 State Route 46 East Batesville IN 47006 / US | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/03] | For all designated states Hill-Rom Services, Inc. 300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 530 Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weizsman, Patrick 8013 Buckland Drive Cincinnati OH 45249 / US | 02 /
Seigle, Gary, S. 961 Harbury Drive Cincinnati OH 45224 / US | 03 /
Barbu, Oliver La Cretinais 44640 Vue / FR | 04 /
Leboeuf, Gaehaul Rue Saint Germain 56370 Sarzeau / FR | 05 /
Hensley, David W. 2077 North Delaware Road Milan IN 47013 / US | 06 /
Duvert, Jean Bernard 62 rue Cuode 56400 Auray / FR | 07 /
Gemeline, Sebastien 36 Les Hauts De Keraude 56270 Ploemuer / FR | [2015/30] |
Former [2015/13] | 01 /
Weizsman, Patrick 8013 Buckland Drive Cincinnati OH 45249 / US | ||
02 /
Seigle, Gary, S. 961 Harbury Drive Cincinnati OH 45224 / US | |||
03 /
Barbu, Oliver La Cretinais 44640 Vue / FR | |||
04 /
Leboeuf, Gaehaul Rue Saint Germain 56370 Sarzeau / FR | |||
05 /
Hensley, David W. 2077 North Delaware Road Milan IN 47013 / US | |||
06 /
Duvert, Jean Bernard 62 rue Cuode 56400 Auray / FR | |||
07 /
Sabastien, Gemeline 36 Les Hauts De Keraude 56270 Ploemuer / FR | |||
Former [2012/15] | 01 /
Weizsman, Patrick 8013 Buckland Drive Cincinnati OH 45249 / US | ||
02 /
Seigle, Gary, S. 961 Harbury Drive Cincinnati OH 45224 / US | |||
03 /
Barbu, Oliver La Cretinais 44640 Vue / FR | |||
04 /
Leboeuf, Gaehaul Rue Saint Germain 56370 Sarzeau / FR | |||
05 /
Hensley, David W. 2077 North Delaware Road Milan IN 47013 / US | |||
06 /
Duvert, Jean Bernard 62 rue Cuode 56400 Auray / FR | |||
07 /
Sebastien, Gemeline 36 Les Hauts De Keraude 56270 Ploemuer / FR | |||
Former [2012/03] | 01 /
Weizsman, Patrick 8013 Buckland Drive Cincinnati OH 45249 / US | ||
02 /
Seigle, Gary, S. 961 Harbury Drive Cincinnati OH 45224 / US | |||
03 /
Barbu, Oliver La Cretinais 44640 Vue / FR | |||
04 /
Leboeuf, Gaehaul Rue Saint Germain 56370 Sarzeau / FR | |||
05 /
Hensley, David W. 2077 North Delaware Road Milan IN 47013 / US | |||
06 /
Duvert, Jean Bernard 62 rue Cuode 56400 Auray / FR | |||
07 /
Sebastien, Gemeline 36 Les Hauts De Keraude 56270 Plocmeur / FR | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/09] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2012/03] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 11173770.6 | 20.05.2004 | [2012/03] | Priority number, date | US20030472260P | 21.05.2003 Original published format: US 472260 P | [2012/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2407138 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2407138 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2407138 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/00, A61G7/002 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
A61G7/015 (EP,US);
A61G7/05 (EP,US);
A61G7/0507 (EP,US);
A61G7/0509 (EP,US);
A61G7/0514 (EP,US);
A61G7/0524 (EP,US);
A61G7/0528 (EP,US);
A61G7/005 (EP,US);
A61G7/018 (EP,US);
A61G7/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/03] | Title | German: | Krankenhausbett | [2014/35] | English: | Hospital bed | [2015/13] | French: | Lit d'hôpital | [2014/35] |
Former [2012/03] | Bremslösealarm für ein Krankenhausbett | ||
Former [2012/03] | Brake release alarm for hospital bed | ||
Former [2012/03] | Alarme de libération de frein pour lit d'hôpital | Examination procedure | 08.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 09.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04753138.9 / EP1624841 | EP10000577.6 / EP2174631 | Divisional application(s) | EP15154916.9 / EP2886097 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.05.2004 | AT | 25.02.2015 | BE | 25.02.2015 | BG | 25.02.2015 | CY | 25.02.2015 | CZ | 25.02.2015 | DK | 25.02.2015 | EE | 25.02.2015 | ES | 25.02.2015 | FI | 25.02.2015 | IT | 25.02.2015 | MC | 25.02.2015 | NL | 25.02.2015 | PL | 25.02.2015 | PT | 25.02.2015 | RO | 25.02.2015 | SE | 25.02.2015 | SI | 25.02.2015 | SK | 25.02.2015 | TR | 25.02.2015 | IE | 20.05.2015 | LU | 20.05.2015 | GR | 26.05.2015 | CH | 31.05.2015 | LI | 31.05.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 20.05.2004 | |
AT | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IE | 20.05.2015 | ||
LU | 20.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
IE | 20.05.2015 | ||
LU | 20.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
IE | 20.05.2015 | ||
LU | 20.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
LU | 20.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
LU | 20.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 25.02.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2311000 (HUNTLEIGH TECHNOLOGY PLC [GB]) [X] 1 * page 3, lines 21-26; figure 1 * [I] 2,3; | [XI]US6209157 (HENSLEY DAVID W [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 23-.36 * * column 5, lines 15-30; figure 1a * [I] 2,3; | [E]WO2007010213 (HUNTLEIGH TECHNOLOGY PLC [GB], et al) [E] 1* paragraph [0027] * | by applicant | EP0681799 | FR2780638 | FR2783463 | US6163903 | US6182310 | WO0232271 | WO02078266 | WO02076266 | US20000750741 | FR20020002510 | US20020408698 |