EP2545898 - Use of cosmetics against infrared radiation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COTY GERMANY GMBH Rheinstrasse 4E 55116 Mainz / DE | [2013/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doucet, Olivier 24 avenue de France F-06190 Roquebrune Cap Martin / FR | 02 /
Pujos, Muriel 51 avenue Corniche Fleurie Les Terrasses du Ciel F-26200 Nice / FR | 03 /
Robert, Cécile Fontaine Vauban, Bat B 47 rue de Roquebillière F-06300 Nice / FR | 04 /
Bernini, Dorothee 31 avenue Hector Otto MC-9000 Monaco / MC | 05 /
Pissavini, Marc 303, Corniche de Magnan F-06000 Nice / FR | [2013/03] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 11173973.6 | 14.07.2011 | [2013/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2545898 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/26, A61K8/29, A61K8/67, A61K8/97, A61Q17/04 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
A61K8/26 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/19 (KR,US);
A61K8/29 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/676 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/678 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q19/00 (KR);
A61K2800/412 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verwendung von Kosmetika gegen Infrarotstrahlung | [2013/03] | English: | Use of cosmetics against infrared radiation | [2013/03] | French: | Utilisation de cosmétiques contre le rayonnement infrarouge | [2013/03] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/04] | 03.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004105706 (COTY BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]EP1591104 (STADA ARZNEIMITTEL AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE102007010861 (COTY PRESTIGE LANCASTER GROUP [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * examples 1, 2 * * claim 1 *; | [Y] - "Firming & Comforting Radiant Tan Body Cream SPF 30", GNPD, Mintel, (201105), Database accession no. 1545688, XP002665365 [Y] 1-10 * Product description; Ingredients * | by applicant | WO2008104607 | EP2233127 | - SKIN, RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 5, pages 260 - 265 |