EP2383601 - Semiconductor device comprising a cavity having a vent hole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silex Microsystems AB P O Box 595 175 26 Järfälla / SE | [2011/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ebefors, Thorbjörn Kallkärrsvägen 28 141 41 HUDDINGE / SE | 02 /
Kälvesten, Edvard Edelcrantzvägen 20 129 38 HÄGERSTEN / SE | 03 /
Ågren, Peter Rosendalsvägen 18A 141 43 HUDDINGE / SE | 04 /
Svedin, Niklas Odengatan 33 113 51 STOCKHOLM / SE | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Brann AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2011/44] | Lindgren, Anders BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 11174118.7 | 23.12.2009 | [2011/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2383601 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2383601 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/08, B81B7/00, G02B6/35, H01L21/768, H01L23/48 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
B81B7/0006 (EP,SE,US);
H01L23/522 (KR);
G02B26/0833 (SE,US);
B81B7/00 (KR);
B81B7/007 (EP,US);
B81C1/00095 (SE);
G02B26/0841 (EP,US);
G02B6/3584 (EP,US);
H01L21/76898 (EP,SE,US);
H01L23/481 (EP,US);
H01L23/5226 (SE);
B81B2207/092 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2011/44] | G02B26/08, B81C1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/44] | Title | German: | Halbleiter mit einem Hohlraum der ein Belüftungsloch aufweist | [2011/44] | English: | Semiconductor device comprising a cavity having a vent hole | [2011/44] | French: | Dispositf semiconducteur ayant une cavité avec un trou de ventilation | [2011/44] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 30.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09835356.8 / EP2377154 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090835356) is 14.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2009 | AT | 23.12.2015 | BE | 23.12.2015 | BG | 23.12.2015 | CY | 23.12.2015 | CZ | 23.12.2015 | DK | 23.12.2015 | EE | 23.12.2015 | ES | 23.12.2015 | FI | 23.12.2015 | HR | 23.12.2015 | IE | 23.12.2015 | IT | 23.12.2015 | LT | 23.12.2015 | LU | 23.12.2015 | LV | 23.12.2015 | MC | 23.12.2015 | MK | 23.12.2015 | MT | 23.12.2015 | NL | 23.12.2015 | PL | 23.12.2015 | RO | 23.12.2015 | SE | 23.12.2015 | SI | 23.12.2015 | SK | 23.12.2015 | SM | 23.12.2015 | TR | 23.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | NO | 23.03.2016 | GR | 24.03.2016 | IS | 23.04.2016 | PT | 26.04.2016 | [2018/31] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 23.12.2009 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BG | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LU | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MT | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
TR | 23.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 23.12.2009 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BG | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MT | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
TR | 23.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | HU | 23.12.2009 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BG | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MT | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 23.12.2015 | |
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 23.12.2015 | |
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 23.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1835324 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]); | by applicant | US2004009624 |