EP2381732 - Method and apparatus for radio link synchronization and power control on CELL_FACH and Idle mode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2016 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2013/15] |
Former [2011/43] | For all designated states InterDigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza, Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, Delaware 19810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pelletier, Benoit 11-13th Street Roxnoro, Québec H8Y 1L3 / CA | 02 /
Marinier, Paul 1805 Stravinski Brossard, Québec J4X 2J7 / CA | 03 /
Cave, Christopher R. 258 Baffin, Dollard-des Ormeaux Montreal, Québec H9A 3J2 / CA | 04 /
Kim, In, H. 1404 Reagan Court Norristown, PA Pennsylvania 19403 / US | 05 /
Girolamo, Rocco 632 de Fribourg Street Laval, Québec H7K 3Y3 / CA | [2011/43] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 1066 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/25] | Awapatent AB P.O. Box 1066 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | ||
Former [2011/43] | Johansson, Magnus, et al Awapatent AB Box 1066 S-251 10 Helsingborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 11174535.2 | 30.12.2008 | [2011/43] | Priority number, date | US20070018059P | 31.12.2007 Original published format: US 18059 P | US20080025695P | 01.02.2008 Original published format: US 25695 P | [2011/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2381732 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2381732 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W56/00 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
H04W52/50 (EP,US);
H04W56/001 (KR);
H04W52/38 (US);
H04L47/12 (US);
H04W52/36 (KR);
H04W56/0005 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/43] | H04W74/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Funkverbindungssynchronisierung und Leistungsregelung im Cell_Fach-Modus und Ruhemodus | [2011/43] | English: | Method and apparatus for radio link synchronization and power control on CELL_FACH and Idle mode | [2011/43] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour une synchronisation et un contrôle de puissance de liaison radio dans un état cell_fach et un mode inactif | [2011/43] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 26.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08870348.3 / EP2227924 | Divisional application(s) | EP13160428.2 / EP2624640 | EP13160429.0 / EP2624641 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080870348) is 14.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.12.2008 | AT | 21.06.2017 | CY | 21.06.2017 | CZ | 21.06.2017 | DK | 21.06.2017 | EE | 21.06.2017 | ES | 21.06.2017 | FI | 21.06.2017 | HR | 21.06.2017 | IT | 21.06.2017 | LT | 21.06.2017 | LV | 21.06.2017 | MC | 21.06.2017 | PL | 21.06.2017 | PT | 21.06.2017 | RO | 21.06.2017 | SE | 21.06.2017 | SI | 21.06.2017 | SK | 21.06.2017 | TR | 21.06.2017 | BG | 21.09.2017 | GR | 22.09.2017 | IS | 21.10.2017 | IE | 30.12.2017 | LU | 30.12.2017 | MT | 30.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 30.12.2008 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
TR | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 30.12.2017 | ||
LU | 30.12.2017 | ||
MT | 30.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 30.12.2008 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 30.12.2017 | ||
LU | 30.12.2017 | ||
MT | 30.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.12.2008 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 30.12.2017 | ||
LU | 30.12.2017 | ||
MT | 30.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 30.12.2017 | ||
LU | 30.12.2017 | ||
MT | 30.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 30.12.2017 | ||
LU | 30.12.2017 | ||
MT | 30.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 30.12.2017 | ||
LU | 30.12.2017 | ||
MT | 30.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 30.12.2017 | ||
LU | 30.12.2017 | ||
MT | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 30.12.2017 | ||
MT | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 21.06.2017 | |
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002089957 (VIERO TIMO [FI]) [A] 1,8 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0058] *; | [A]WO2006117629 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1,8 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0026] *; | [A]US2007140162 (TAYLOR CAROLYN [US]) [A] 1,8 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0022] ** figure 4 * | Examination | US2005281222 |